EP 2536548 A1 20121226 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF COATED MOLDINGS, APPARATUS AND PRODUCT
Title (en)
METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF COATED MOLDINGS, APPARATUS AND PRODUCT
Title (de)
VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BESCHICHTETEN FORMKÖRPERN, VORRICHTUNG UND PRODUKT
Title (fr)
PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CORPS MOULÉS REVÊTUS, DISPOSITIF ET PRODUIT
Publication
Application
Priority
- DE 102010002164 A 20100219
- EP 2010069696 W 20101215
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2011101057A1] The invention relates to a method for producing coated molded bodies having completely or partially structured surfaces. The invention further relates to a system for performing said method.
IPC 8 full level
B29C 45/16 (2006.01); B29C 37/00 (2006.01); B29C 45/37 (2006.01); B29C 45/56 (2006.01); B81C 1/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: BR EP KR US)
B29C 37/0028 (2013.01 - BR EP US); B29C 37/0053 (2013.01 - BR EP KR US); B29C 45/1679 (2013.01 - BR EP KR US); B29C 45/37 (2013.01 - BR KR); B29C 45/372 (2013.01 - BR EP US); B29C 45/561 (2013.01 - BR EP US); B29C 2045/563 (2013.01 - BR EP US); B29C 2045/569 (2013.01 - KR); B29K 2033/12 (2013.01 - BR EP US); B29K 2995/0022 (2013.01 - BR EP US); B29K 2995/0024 (2013.01 - BR EP US); B29K 2995/003 (2013.01 - BR EP US); Y10T 428/24612 (2015.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
See references of WO 2011101057A1
Citation (examination)
- FRANK BURMEISTER: "Hybridschichten für die Erzeugung beständiger, funktionaler Komponenten", 20 January 2010 (2010-01-20), pages 1 - 3, XP055378478, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.iwm.fraunhofer.de/content/dam/iwm/geschaeftsfelder/materialdesign/funktionale_schichtmaterialien/skform/Hybridschichten_Entformung_jb_d_2009_g51_FraunhoferIWM.pdf> [retrieved on 20170602]
- BURR ET AL: "NanoSkin: Bestaendige Nanostrukturen im Visier", KUNSTSTOFFBERA, 201975 1, vol. 54, September 2009 (2009-09-01), pages 33 - 36, XP009194268, ISSN: 0172-6374
- DORIS HIRSCH: "PLEXIGLAS im Fahrzeuginnenbereich: Freiheit in Form und Farbe", 13 October 2009 (2009-10-13), pages 1 - 3, XP055369701, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://corporate.evonik.de/_layouts/Websites/Internet/NewsAttachmentHandlerSec.ashx?fileid=5776&newsid=11814&NewsSecToken=1MG/heiWCuOjeXOm8YoO4Wyo/KxrbSKJmlMWNXKRNLuR8OeJUpynZyQzKtQvYgVF> [retrieved on 20170504]
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2011101057 A1 20110825; BR 112012020824 A2 20170627; BR 112012020824 B1 20191217; CA 2790601 A1 20110825; CA 2790601 C 20180320; CN 102869488 A 20130109; CN 102869488 B 20160302; DE 102010002164 A1 20111006; DE 102010002164 A8 20130711; DE 102010002164 A8 20130912; EP 2536548 A1 20121226; HK 1175439 A1 20130705; JP 2013519545 A 20130530; JP 5907897 B2 20160426; KR 101794367 B1 20171106; KR 20120133379 A 20121210; MX 2012009652 A 20120912; MX 337303 B 20160224; MY 164700 A 20180130; RU 2012139789 A 20140327; RU 2570013 C2 20151210; SG 182747 A1 20120927; TW 201141676 A 20111201; TW I496673 B 20150821; US 2012321857 A1 20121220; US 9199398 B2 20151201
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 2010069696 W 20101215; BR 112012020824 A 20101215; CA 2790601 A 20101215; CN 201080064105 A 20101215; DE 102010002164 A 20100219; EP 10787818 A 20101215; HK 13102501 A 20130227; JP 2012553200 A 20101215; KR 20127021564 A 20101215; MX 2012009652 A 20101215; MY PI2012003556 A 20101215; RU 2012139789 A 20101215; SG 2012055497 A 20101215; TW 100105072 A 20110216; US 201013579048 A 20101215