EP 2540174 B1 20170621 - Tobacco Filter Containing Magnesium Aluminometasilicate
Title (en)
Tobacco Filter Containing Magnesium Aluminometasilicate
Title (de)
Tabakfilter mit Magnesiumaluminiummetallsilikat
Title (fr)
Filtre de tabac contenant un aluminométasilicate de magnésium
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 11171926 A 20110629
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP2540174A1] A tobacco filter contains from 0.5 to 95 % by mass of magnesium aluminometasilicate.
IPC 8 full level
A24D 3/16 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A24D 3/166 (2013.01)
Citation (examination)
- GB 1481680 A 19770803 - SHEPARD M
- US 3718612 A 19730227 - STRICKMAN R
- EP 1470761 A1 20041027 - JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]
- FUJI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO. ET AL: "The Specialty Excipient Neusilin", 1 January 2010 (2010-01-01), XP055165535, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.fujichemical.co.jp/english/medical/medicine/neusilin/index.html> [retrieved on 20150128]
- "The Speciality Excipient Neusilin", 1 July 2009 (2009-07-01), pages 1 - 24, XP055250935, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.harke.com/fileadmin/images/pharma/Broschueren/Fuji_Neusilin.pdf> [retrieved on 20160217]
- GENSOL PHARMA PVT. LTD.: "Magnesium Aluminum Silicate", 1 April 2016 (2016-04-01), pages 1 - 9, XP055317206, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.excipientsguide.com/excipient_details.aspx?Id=67> [retrieved on 20161108]
- JUAN LOPEZ-GONZALEZ ET AL: "Surface Area Changes of a Vermiculite by Acid and Thermal Treatment", CLAYS AND CLAY MINERALS, 1 January 1957 (1957-01-01), pages 399 - 405, XP055317211, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.clays.org/journal/archive/volume 6/6-1-399.pdf> [retrieved on 20161107], DOI: 10.1346/CCMN.1957.0060130
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 11171926 A 20110629