Global Patent Index - EP 2552799 A4

EP 2552799 A4 2013-09-11 - CONTAINER SEALING SYSTEM

Title (en)

CONTAINER SEALING SYSTEM

Title (de)

CONTAINERDICHTUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTÈME D'ÉTANCHÉISATION DE RÉCIPIENT

Publication

EP 2552799 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 11766420 A

Priority

  • US 31887110 P
  • US 2011030138 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2011126793A2] A cap for a container (e.g., container fitment) includes a neck portion and a lip portion that extends laterally outward from the neck portion. A gasket is provided between the cap and a rim of a container fitment. The neck portion is conical or frustoconical in shape, and an interior surface of a container port or fitment may be correspondingly tapered, to guide the cap into concentric alignment with the gasket and rim during insertion of the neck portion of the cap into the fitment. Such alignment promotes positive sealing engagement between the cap, gasket, and fitment. In one embodiment, the cap defines an externally accessible recess that optionally includes a handle, such as at least one segmenting wall, for grasping by a user to facilitate manipulation of the cap. The cap may be affixed to a fitment of a flexible liner.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 39/16 (2006.01); B65D 25/08 (2006.01); B65D 39/04 (2006.01); B65D 45/20 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 39/04 (2013.01); B65D 39/16 (2013.01); B65D 45/20 (2013.01); C12M 23/14 (2013.01); C12M 23/38 (2013.01); C12M 27/02 (2013.01); B65D 2539/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2011126793 A2 20111013; WO 2011126793 A3 20120223; EP 2552799 A2 20130206; EP 2552799 A4 20130911; US 2013026167 A1 20130131

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151117

2015-08-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150706

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PALL TECHNOLOGY UK LIMITED

2013-09-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130809

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 45/20 20060101ALI20130805BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 25/08 20060101ALI20130805BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 39/16 20060101AFI20130805BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 39/04 20060101ALI20130805BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 81/32 20060101ALI20130805BHEP

2013-07-03 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2013-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20121019

2013-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR