Global Patent Index - EP 2556933 A4

EP 2556933 A4 2017-10-04 - MACHINE FOR CLEAVING SLATE

Title (en)

MACHINE FOR CLEAVING SLATE

Title (de)

MASCHINE ZUM SPALTEN VON SCHIEFER

Title (fr)

ÉCAILLEUSE DE PIÈCES D'ARDOISE

Publication

EP 2556933 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 11765117 A

Priority

  • ES 201030511 A
  • ES 2011070168 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2556933A1] This machine is intended to cleave a slate block to obtain slate sheets using a cutter on the upper side face of the slate block with the bases thereof arranged on vertical planes. It is characterized in that it comprises at least two work stations corresponding to two longitudinal beds of rollers (1) that are interrupted in a central transversal zone where there are tilting support elements (3) that flip the slate blocks (4) initially drawn by these rollers. Level with this central transversal zone there is a movable truck (8) superiorly suspended from transversal guide bars (9), such that said truck incorporates the corresponding cutting cutter and also a characteristic clamp to seal the shear plane of the corresponding slate block (4).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/322 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2556933 A1 20130213; EP 2556933 A4 20171004; BR 112012025691 A2 20180515; CA 2795607 A1 20111013; ES 2366842 A1 20111026; ES 2366842 B2 20120907; WO 2011124735 A1 20111013

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180129

2018-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MARINELLI, GIORDANO

2017-10-04 [RA4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170905

2017-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B28B 1/32 20060101AFI20170830BHEP

2013-07-17 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2013-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MARINELLI, GIORDANO

2013-02-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20121010

2013-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR