Global Patent Index - EP 2560762 B1

EP 2560762 B1 2017-10-04 - HAMMER MILL

Title (en)

HAMMER MILL

Title (de)

HAMMERMÜHLE

Title (fr)

BROYEUR À MARTEAUX

Publication

EP 2560762 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 11713892 A

Priority

  • PL 39053910 A
  • PL 2011000020 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2011105918A2] Hammer mill beaters (1) placed on the blades of the beater rotor (3) in a manner that allows for their rotation around the axes perpendicular to the beater rotor blades (3). The beaters (1) are located in the beaters chucks (2) equipped with a pin mounted in the slots of the beater rotor blades (3). The beaters (!) are mounted in the beaters chucks (2) in a manner that allows for their rotation around the axes perpendicular to the beaters chucks (2). The beaters (1) are in the shape of a cylinder with a wider element at one end and a slot perpendicular to the axis of the cylinder. The beaters are mounted in the slots of the beaters chucks and secured with a cotter pin. The outer surface of the beaters (1) is made of the material which is more resistant to wear than the beater's core (1). The blades of the beater rotor (3) are surrounded by screens (5) in the shape of a sector of the lateral surface of the cylinder and guards (6) in the shape of two sectors of the lateral surfaces of the cylinder connected to a rectangle. The guards (6) are placed in the covers (7) connected with the housing of the hammer mill (8) by hinges.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/04 (2006.01); B02C 13/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/04 (2013.01); B02C 13/28 (2013.01); B02C 2013/2808 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

PL 349273 A1 20030224 - PALCZEWSKI STANISLAW [PL], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

WO 2011105918 A2 20110901; WO 2011105918 A3 20130314; EP 2560762 A2 20130227; EP 2560762 B1 20171004; PL 216004 B1 20140228; PL 390539 A1 20110829; RU 2012140713 A 20140327; RU 2543287 C2 20150227; UA 87750 U 20140225

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2017-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 933504 T

- Effective date: 20171015

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME

2017-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2016-08-03 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160707

2015-06-17 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150518

2015-06-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150508

2013-04-17 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120926

2013-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME