Global Patent Index - EP 2575958 A4

EP 2575958 A4 2013-09-18 - WAVEFORM SHAPES FOR TREATING NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS OPTIMIZED FOR ENERGY EFFICIENCY

Title (en)

WAVEFORM SHAPES FOR TREATING NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS OPTIMIZED FOR ENERGY EFFICIENCY

Title (de)

ENERGIEEFFIZIENT OPTIMIERTE KURVENFORMEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG NEUROLOGISCHER ERKRANKUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROFILS DE FORME D'ONDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES NEUROLOGIQUES OPTIMISÉS POUR UNE EFFICACITÉ ÉNERGÉTIQUE

Publication

EP 2575958 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 11787528 A

Priority

  • US 34896310 P
  • US 2011038416 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2011150377A2] Systems and methods for stimulation of neurological tissue apply a stimulation waveform that is derived by a developed genetic algorithm (GA), which may be coupled to a computational model of extracellular stimulation of a mammalian myelinated axon. The waveform is optimized for energy efficiency.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/36146 (2013.01); A61N 1/3606 (2013.01); A61N 1/36175 (2013.01); A61N 1/0529 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 2011150377A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2011150377 A2 20111201; WO 2011150377 A3 20120202; AU 2011258026 A1 20121220; AU 2016201521 A1 20160324; AU 2016201521 B2 20170720; AU 2017228526 A1 20171005; CA 2800889 A1 20111201; CN 103108670 A 20130515; CN 103108670 B 20161012; CN 106215325 A 20161214; EP 2575958 A2 20130410; EP 2575958 A4 20130918; EP 2575958 B1 20171018; JP 2013526962 A 20130627; JP 5847167 B2 20160120; US 2012136408 A1 20120531; US 2016129258 A1 20160512; US 2017312527 A1 20171102; US 9089708 B2 20150728; US 9707397 B2 20170718

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602011042537

2017-11-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 937416 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-06-07 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170510

2015-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20151124

2013-09-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130821

2013-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61N 1/32 20060101AFI20130814BHEP

2013-09-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2013-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20121224

2013-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR