Global Patent Index - EP 2594759 A8

EP 2594759 A8 2013-09-11 - EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

ABGASREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 2594759 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 10824261 A

Priority

JP 2010062001 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2012131907A1] The present invention has for its subject to avoid a situation that condensed water stays around electrode terminals, in an electric heating type exhaust gas purification apparatus which is arranged in an exhaust system of an internal combustion engine. In order to solve this subject, the present invention resides in an exhaust gas purification apparatus of an internal combustion engine which is provided with a catalyst carrier having electrodes, a case in which the catalyst carrier is accommodated, a mat member arranged between the catalyst carrier and the case, a space part extending from the catalyst carrier to the case while passing through the mat member, and electrode terminals accommodated in said space part for supplying electric power to the electrodes of the catalyst carrier, wherein exhaust gas and condensed water are kept from permeating into the space part through the mat member or the catalyst carrier, by the provision of a pressure supply unit which supplies a positive pressure to the space part.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/20 (2006.01); F01N 3/02 (2006.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/008 (2013.01); F01N 3/2013 (2013.01); F01N 3/2026 (2013.01); F01N 3/2853 (2013.01); F01N 3/2871 (2013.01); F01N 3/323 (2013.01); F01N 2240/16 (2013.01); F01N 2330/06 (2013.01); F01N 2470/08 (2013.01); Y02T 10/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2012131907 A1 20120531; US 8863498 B2 20141021; CN 102985653 A 20130320; CN 102985653 B 20150107; EP 2594759 A1 20130522; EP 2594759 A4 20140108; EP 2594759 A8 20130911; EP 2594759 B1 20150902; JP 5120500 B2 20130116; JP WO2012008038 A1 20130905; WO 2012008038 A1 20120119

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 SM] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SM

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2018-05-31 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO

- Effective date: 20100715

2018-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170712

- Year of fee payment: 8

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2017-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160715

2017-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160715

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2017-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 8

2017-05-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-08-31 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20160603

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 7

2016-06-03 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602010027267

2016-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160104

2016-05-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-05-25 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-04-29 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160102

2016-04-29 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-04-29 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-04-29 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-04-20 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 602010027267

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-02-29 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-02-10 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2016-02-10 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-01-29 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-01-29 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-01-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151203

2016-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-01-29 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151202

2016-01-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 746767 T

- Effective date: 20150902

2015-10-15 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602010027267

2015-09-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2015-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2015-09-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 746767 T

- Effective date: 20150915

2015-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

2015-09-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2015-03-11 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150212

2015-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01N 3/20 20060101AFI20150116BHEP

2015-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01N 3/32 20060101ALI20150116BHEP

2015-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01N 3/02 20060101ALI20150116BHEP

2015-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01N 3/28 20060101ALI20150116BHEP

2014-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TAKAGI, NAOYA

2014-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOSHIOKA, MAMORU

2014-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUMAGAI, NORIAKI

2014-01-08 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20131205

2014-01-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01N 3/28 20060101ALI20131129BHEP

2014-01-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01N 3/20 20060101AFI20131129BHEP

2014-01-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01N 3/32 20060101ALI20131129BHEP

2014-01-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01N 3/02 20060101ALI20131129BHEP

2013-10-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2013-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOSHIOKA, MAMORU

2013-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUMAGAI, NORIAKI

2013-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TAKAGI, NAOYA

2013-09-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUMAGAI, NORIAKI

2013-09-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOSHIOKA, MAMORU

2013-09-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TAKAGI, NAOYA

2013-07-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUMAGAI, NORIAKI

2013-07-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOSHIOKA, MAMORU

2013-07-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TAKAGI, NAOYA

2013-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120213

2013-05-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR