Global Patent Index - EP 2603853 A4

EP 2603853 A4 2015-01-07 - MOVING ENTERPRISE SOFTWARE APPLICATIONS TO A CLOUD DOMAIN

Title (en)

MOVING ENTERPRISE SOFTWARE APPLICATIONS TO A CLOUD DOMAIN

Title (de)

VERSCHIEBUNG VON UNTERNEHMENSSOFTWAREANWENDUNGEN IN EINE CLOUD-DOMÄNE

Title (fr)

DÉPLACEMENT D'APPLICATIONS LOGICIELLES D'UNE ENTREPRISE VERS UN DOMAINE D'INFONUAGIQUE

Publication

EP 2603853 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 11816805 A

Priority

  • US 201113152349 A
  • US 201113158571 A
  • US 201113158580 A
  • US 201113152341 A
  • US 37292810 P
  • US 37524910 P
  • US 2011046150 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012021324A2] Methods and systems for moving or porting an enterprise software application from an enterprise environment to a cloud domain are disclosed. An automated moving software program identifies enterprise components of an enterprise software application. The program assigns an enterprise component tag to the identified enterprise component. The program then assigns an enterprise attribute tag to the identified enterprise component and searches an attribute relationship map for at least one cloud attribute related to the assigned enterprise attribute. On identification of such a cloud attribute, the cloud attribute is assigned to the identified enterprise component and the enterprise component is converted to cloud component by creating a new cloud component to replicate the functions of the enterprise component or assigning a cloud component tag to the enterprise component, provided the enterprise component is render-able on the cloud domain resources.

IPC 8 full level

G06F 9/06 (2006.01); G06F 9/44 (2006.01); G06F 9/48 (2006.01); G06F 9/50 (2006.01)

CPC

G06F 8/76 (2013.01); G06F 9/4856 (2013.01); G06F 9/5072 (2013.01); G06F 9/5077 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [I] PARASTOO MOHAGHEGHI ET AL: "Reuse and Migration of Legacy Systems to Interoperable Cloud Services - The REMICS project", PROCEEDINGS OF FORTH WORKSHOP ON MODELING, DESIGN AND ANALYSIS FOR THE SERVICE CLOUD (MDA4SERVICECLOUD 2010) IN THE 6TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON MODELLING FOUNDATIONS AND APPLICATIONSMDA4SERVICECLOUD'10 (ECMFA 2010), 5TH JUNE 2010, PARIS, FRANCE, 15 June 2010 (2010-06-15), pages 1 - 8, XP055155829
  • [IA] SÖREN FREY ET AL: "Model-Based Migration of Legacy Software Systems into the Cloud: The CloudMIG Approach", 12. WORKSHOP SOFTWARE-REENGINEERING (WSR 2010),BAD HONNEF, 5 May 2010 (2010-05-05), Bad Honnef, pages 1 - 20, XP055155748, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://fg-sre.gi.de/fileadmin/gliederungen/fg-sre/wsr2010/28FreyHasselbing.pdf> [retrieved on 20141128]
  • [IPA] SÖREN FREY ET AL: "Model-Based Migration of Legacy Software Systems to Scalable and Resource-Efficient Cloud-Based Applications: The CloudMIG Approach", PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIRST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CLOUD COMPUTING, GRIDS, AND VIRTUALIZATION (CLOUD COMPUTING 2010), 21-26 NOV 2010, LISBON, PORTUGAL, 21 November 2010 (2010-11-21), pages 155 - 158, XP055155820, ISBN: 978-1-61-208106-9, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:www.thinkmind.org/download.php?articleid=cloud_computing_2010_6_40_50065> [retrieved on 20141128]
  • [A] LUIS M VAQUERO ET AL: "A break in the clouds", COMPUTER COMMUNICATION REVIEW, vol. 39, no. 1, January 2009 (2009-01-01), pages 50 - 55, XP058023767, ISSN: 0146-4833, DOI: 10.1145/1496091.1496100
  • [A] DARRYL CHANTRY ET AL: "The Architecture Journal", INTERNET CITATION, 9 April 2009 (2009-04-09), pages 1 - 44, XP002602108, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:www.architecturejournal.net> [retrieved on 20100923]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family

WO 2012021324 A2 20120216; WO 2012021324 A3 20120426; AU 2011289732 A1 20130321; AU 2011289732 B2 20151105; AU 2011289734 A1 20130321; AU 2011289734 B2 20160616; AU 2011289736 A1 20130321; AU 2011289736 B2 20160630; AU 2011289738 A1 20130321; AU 2016203802 A1 20160623; CA 2807983 A1 20120216; CA 2807995 A1 20120216; CA 2808005 A1 20120216; CA 2808013 A1 20120216; EP 2603853 A2 20130619; EP 2603853 A4 20150107; EP 2603854 A2 20130619; EP 2603854 A4 20150318; EP 2603855 A2 20130619; EP 2603855 A4 20130710; EP 2603857 A2 20130619; WO 2012021326 A2 20120216; WO 2012021326 A3 20120503; WO 2012021328 A2 20120216; WO 2012021328 A3 20120412; WO 2012021330 A2 20120216; WO 2012021330 A3 20120426