Global Patent Index - EP 2611977 B1

EP 2611977 B1 2017-10-11 - ACTUATING UNIT FOR AUTOMOTIVE APPLICATIONS

Title (en)

ACTUATING UNIT FOR AUTOMOTIVE APPLICATIONS

Title (de)

STELLEINHEIT FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGTECHNISCHE ANWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

UNITÉ D'ACTIONNEMENT POUR APPLICATIONS EN TECHNIQUE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 2611977 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 10765740 A

Priority

DE 2010001013 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012028120A1] The invention relates to an actuating unit for automotive applications, which comprises a drive (2) and an actuator (3, 4) that can be acted upon by the drive (2). According to the invention, the actuating unit (3, 4) in question is made entirely or partly of plastic.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/06 (2014.01); E05B 15/16 (2006.01); E05B 81/24 (2014.01); E05B 81/20 (2014.01); E05B 81/64 (2014.01); E05B 85/02 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 15/1635 (2013.01); E05B 81/25 (2013.01); E05B 81/20 (2013.01); E05B 81/64 (2013.01); E05B 85/02 (2013.01); E05B 2015/1664 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7062 (2015.04)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2012028120 A1 20120308; CN 103080450 A 20130501; CN 103080450 B 20160706; EP 2611977 A1 20130710; EP 2611977 B1 20171011; RU 2013108193 A 20141010; RU 2561023 C2 20150820; US 2013152645 A1 20130620

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180211

2018-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180112

2018-05-31 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-05-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180111

2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180111

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-02-26 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-02-14 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20171011

2017-11-23 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502010014253

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 936193 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-07-05 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170606

2017-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 15/16 20060101ALI20170519BHEP

2017-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 81/20 20140101ALN20170519BHEP

2017-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 81/64 20140101ALN20170519BHEP

2017-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 81/24 20140101ALI20170519BHEP

2017-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 81/06 20140101AFI20170519BHEP

2017-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 85/02 20140101ALN20170519BHEP

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 85/02 20140101ALN20170515BHEP

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 81/64 20140101ALN20170515BHEP

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 81/06 20140101AFI20170515BHEP

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 15/16 20060101ALI20170515BHEP

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 81/24 20140101ALI20170515BHEP

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 81/20 20140101ALN20170515BHEP

2017-05-19 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502010014253

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: E05B0065200000

- IPC: E05B0081060000

2016-11-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20161013

2013-12-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2013-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130221

2013-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR