EP 2620372 A1 20130731 - Packing method employing non-dry, re-stick glue
Title (en)
Packing method employing non-dry, re-stick glue
Title (de)
Verpackungsverfahren mit nicht trockenem, mehrmals verwendbarem Klebstoff
Title (fr)
Procédé d'emballage utilisant une colle non sèche à réutilisation
Publication
Application
Priority
IT BO20120034 A 20120126
Abstract (en)
A packing method for producing a package (1) by folding at least one blank (23) around a group (2) of articles; between two parts (20"', 8) to be joined of the package (1), both a non-dry, re-stick first glue (79) and a permanent drying second glue (78), different from the first glue (79), are applied; and the two parts (20"', 8) are then brought into contact, to glue the two parts (20"', 8) together by means of the first glue (79) and the second glue (78).
IPC 8 full level
B65B 19/18 (2006.01); B65B 19/20 (2006.01); B65B 19/22 (2006.01); B65B 51/02 (2006.01); B65D 5/66 (2006.01); B65D 85/10 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B65B 19/18 (2013.01 - EP US); B65B 19/20 (2013.01 - EP); B65B 19/223 (2013.01 - EP); B65B 19/228 (2013.01 - EP); B65B 51/02 (2013.01 - EP); B65D 5/6685 (2013.01 - EP); B65D 85/1036 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 3340847 A 19670912 - MILLER JOSEPH A, et al
- [A] US 2011041463 A1 20110224 - SQUARZONI MICHELE [IT], et al
Citation (third parties)
Third party :
- WO 2008043435 A1 20080417 - FOCKE & CO [DE], et al
- WO 2009092419 A2 20090730 - FOCKE & CO [DE], et al
- DE 102008029929 A1 20091231 - FOCKE & CO [DE]
- EP 0942056 A1 19990915 - GD SPA [IT]
- HENKEL: "TECHNOMELT PS 9625. HOT MELT ADHESIVE", HENKEL TECHNICAL DATA SHEET, May 2010 (2010-05-01), XP003035079
- H.B. FULLER: "LUNATACH PHC 2198", H.B. FULLER PRODUKTINFORMATION, 1 December 2005 (2005-12-01), pages 1 - 2, XP003035080
- HENKEL: "TECHNOMELT TACK 003A. FORMULATED HOT MELT ADHESIVE", HENKEL TECHNICAL DATA SHEET, March 2010 (2010-03-01), XP003035081
- ADHESIVE DIVISION: "PRODUCT DATA SHEET 0305/KEH/02", NATIONAL STACH & CHEMICAL, XP003035082
- HENKEL: "DURO-TAK MQ-967", HENKEL PRODUCT DATA SHEET, 29 January 2001 (2001-01-29), XP003035083
- H.B. FULLER: "NW 1028 ZEROPACK", H.B. FULLER TECHNICAL DATA SHEET, May 2001 (2001-05-01), XP003035084
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 2620372 A1 20130731; EP 2620372 B1 20160127; IT BO20120034 A1 20130727; PL 2620372 T3 20160531
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 13152951 A 20130128; IT BO20120034 A 20120126; PL 13152951 T 20130128