Global Patent Index - EP 2621303 A4

EP 2621303 A4 2017-10-11 - EASY SLIP SHOE

Title (en)

EASY SLIP SHOE

Title (de)

SCHUH ZUM LEICHTEN HEREINSCHLÜPFEN

Title (fr)

CHAUSSURE FACILE À ENFILER

Publication

EP 2621303 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 11829992 A

Priority

  • US 89659810 A
  • US 2011054298 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2012079742A1] Embodiments of the present invention relate to a construction of a shoe that includes a tongue that has a first fastener attached along a portion of either a medial side or a lateral side of the tongue. Additionally, a stretchable member is attached near a portion of the medial side or the lateral side of the tongue that is opposite of the first fastener. The first fastener is attachable to the upper near the location of the first fastener on the tongue. Similarly, the stretchable member is attached to the upper near the location of the stretchable member on the tongue.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 23/26 (2006.01); A43C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 23/047 (2013.01); A43C 11/002 (2013.01); A43C 11/004 (2013.01); A43C 11/006 (2013.01); A43C 11/1493 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2012079742 A1 20120405; EP 2621303 A1 20130807; EP 2621303 A4 20171011; EP 2621303 B1 20180516; WO 2012044976 A1 20120405

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180516

2018-10-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180816

2018-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180516

2018-10-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180516

2018-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180516

2018-10-31 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180816

2018-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180918

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180828

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-10-10 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-09-19 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20180516

2018-08-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-06-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 998740 T

- Effective date: 20180615

2018-06-14 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602011048465

2018-06-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2018-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2018-05-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2018-01-17 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171222

2017-10-11 [RA4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170908

2017-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A43C 11/00 20060101ALI20170904BHEP

2017-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A43B 23/26 20060101AFI20170904BHEP

2014-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALL STAR C.V.

2014-01-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2013-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR