Global Patent Index - EP 2632278 A2

EP 2632278 A2 2013-09-04 - JATROPHA CURCAS PROCESSING METHODS AND PRODUCTS

Title (en)

JATROPHA CURCAS PROCESSING METHODS AND PRODUCTS

Title (de)

JATROPHA-CURCAS-VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -PRODUKTE

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉS DE TRANSFORMATION DE JATROPHA CURCAS ET PRODUITS RÉSULTANTS

Publication

EP 2632278 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 11837023 A

Priority

  • US 40671910 P
  • US 2011057896 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012058315A2] A process for preparing a food or feed composition from J. curcas is disclosed. The method involves adding an acidified aqueous solution to J. curcas components, to a final pH of between 1 and 5, incubating the acidified mixture for a period for a period of at least 1 hour, and centrifuging the incubated mixture to separate the mixture into three physically distinct fractions: (i) a light, upper fraction containing oil, (ii) an aqueous fraction containing soluble acid-extracted components and breakdown products, and (iii) a substantially detoxified solid cake which forms or is used in forming the food or feed composition. The acidified aqueous solution added may be acidified olive vegetation water having a ratio of hydroxytyrosol to oleuropein of between 5:1 to 100:1. Also disclosed are a food or feed composition, and oil and aqueous fractions formed by the method.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23K 1/14 (2006.01); A23L 1/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23K 50/80 (2016.05); A23D 9/007 (2013.01); A23D 9/02 (2013.01); A23K 10/30 (2016.05); A23K 10/37 (2016.05); A23K 20/158 (2016.05); A23K 50/10 (2016.05); A23K 50/30 (2016.05); A23K 50/75 (2016.05); A23L 33/105 (2016.08); A23L 33/115 (2016.08); A61K 36/47 (2013.01); C11B 1/06 (2013.01); C11B 1/10 (2013.01); C11B 5/0035 (2013.01); Y02P 60/877 (2015.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2012058315 A2 20120503; WO 2012058315 A3 20120726; AP 201306861 A0 20130531; BR 112013010139 A2 20160705; CN 103269604 A 20130828; CN 103269604 B 20160309; EP 2632278 A2 20130904; EP 2632278 A4 20171129

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-29 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20171027

2017-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23K 50/80 20160101ALI20171023BHEP

2017-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23K 50/75 20160101ALI20171023BHEP

2017-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 36/47 20060101ALI20171023BHEP

2017-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C11B 1/10 20060101ALI20171023BHEP

2017-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23K 10/30 20160101ALI20171023BHEP

2017-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23D 9/02 20060101ALI20171023BHEP

2017-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23D 9/007 20060101AFI20171023BHEP

2017-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C11B 1/06 20060101ALI20171023BHEP

2017-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C11B 5/00 20060101ALI20171023BHEP

2017-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23K 50/30 20160101ALI20171023BHEP

2017-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23K 50/10 20160101ALI20171023BHEP

2017-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23K 20/158 20160101ALI20171023BHEP

2017-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23K 10/37 20160101ALI20171023BHEP

2017-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23D 9/02 20060101ALI20170721BHEP

2017-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23K 50/30 20160101ALI20170721BHEP

2017-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C11B 1/06 20060101ALI20170721BHEP

2017-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23K 10/30 20160101ALI20170721BHEP

2017-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 36/47 20060101ALI20170721BHEP

2017-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23K 10/37 20160101ALI20170721BHEP

2017-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23K 20/158 20160101ALI20170721BHEP

2017-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23K 50/75 20160101ALI20170721BHEP

2017-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C11B 1/10 20060101ALI20170721BHEP

2017-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23K 50/80 20160101ALI20170721BHEP

2017-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23D 9/007 20060101AFI20170721BHEP

2017-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23K 50/10 20160101ALI20170721BHEP

2017-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C11B 5/00 20060101ALI20170721BHEP

2014-05-30 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1189128

2014-04-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGROILS TECHNOLOGIES SRL

2014-04-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CREA, ROBERTO

2014-01-29 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2013-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130524

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR