Global Patent Index - EP 2633287 A1

EP 2633287 A1 2013-09-04 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR THE NON-DESTRUCTIVE MEASUREMENT OF DIFFUSION IN NON-UNIFORM SUBSTRATES

Title (en)

METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR THE NON-DESTRUCTIVE MEASUREMENT OF DIFFUSION IN NON-UNIFORM SUBSTRATES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIEN DIFFUSIONSMESSUNG IN UNGLEICHMÄSSIGEN SUBSTRATEN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER UNE MESURE NON DESTRUCTRICE DE DIFFUSION DANS DES SUBSTRATS NON UNIFORMES

Publication

EP 2633287 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 11837177 A

Priority

  • US 40840810 P
  • US 2011058333 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012058567A1] Non-invasive THz spectroscopic apparatus and methods are provided for measuring the average diffusion coefficients for a structure such as cork. The methods may be used to image the localized presence of water in the structure to produce time-dependent images of liquid propagation in the structure.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/35 (2006.01); G01N 21/31 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/3554 (2013.01); G01N 21/3563 (2013.01); G01N 21/3577 (2013.01); G01N 21/3586 (2013.01); G01N 21/909 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2012058567 A1 20120503; EP 2633287 A1 20130904; EP 2633287 A4 20170517

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20171121

2017-05-17 [RA4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170418

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 21/31 20060101ALI20170410BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 21/3586 20140101ALI20170410BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 21/3554 20140101ALI20170410BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 21/3563 20140101ALI20170410BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 21/35 20140101AFI20170410BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 21/90 20060101ALI20170410BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 21/3577 20140101ALI20170410BHEP

2015-11-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FEDERICI, JOHN, FRANCIS

2014-02-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2013-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130411

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR