Global Patent Index - EP 2633441 A1

EP 2633441 A1 2013-09-04 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR A DEVICE IDENTIFIER BASED SOLUTION FOR USER IDENTIFICATION

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR A DEVICE IDENTIFIER BASED SOLUTION FOR USER IDENTIFICATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE AUF EINEM VORRICHTUNGSIDENTIFIKATOR BASIERENDE LÖSUNG ZUR BENUTZERIDENTIFIKATION

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR SOLUTION D'IDENTIFICATION D'UTILISATEUR BASÉE SUR UN IDENTIFIANT DE DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 2633441 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 11835682 A

Priority

  • US 91147010 A
  • FI 2011050733 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2012102008A1] An approach is provided for a device identifier based solution for user identification. A device identifier component receives from a user device a request for access to a service platform. The device identifier component determines one or more identifiers associated with the user device and generates a record of the access with respect to the one or more identifiers.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); H04M 3/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 4/21 (2018.02); G06F 21/10 (2013.01); G06Q 30/0201 (2013.01); H04W 4/06 (2013.01); H04W 4/206 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2012102008 A1 20120426; US 9723463 B2 20170801; CN 103262077 A 20130821; CN 103262077 B 20170208; EP 2633441 A1 20130904; EP 2633441 A4 20170920; WO 2012056089 A1 20120503

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-20 [RA4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170821

2017-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06Q 30/06 20120101ALI20170814BHEP

2017-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 17/30 20060101AFI20170814BHEP

2017-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04M 3/42 20060101ALI20170814BHEP

2015-08-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY

2014-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

2014-01-29 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2013-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130423

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR