Global Patent Index - EP 2633685 A1

EP 2633685 A1 2013-09-04 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ADAPTIVE VIDEO CODING

Title (en)

SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ADAPTIVE VIDEO CODING

Title (de)

SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR ADAPTIVE VIDEOKODIERUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CODAGE VIDÉO ADAPTATIF

Publication

EP 2633685 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 11779073 A

Priority

  • US 40732910 P
  • US 2011058027 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012058394A1] Systems and methods are described for determining an optimised sampling ratio for coding video data that reduces overall distortion introduced by the coding process. It seeks to balance the information loss introduced during downsampling and the information loss introduced during coding. The sampling ratio is generally determined by reducing, or in some cases minimizing, the overall error introduced through the downsampling process and the coding process, and may be adaptive based on the content of the video data being processed and a target bit rate. Computation power can be saved by coding a downsampled video. The process derives a plurality of downsampling ratios, and selects a downsampling ratio that reduces the total amount of distortion introduced during the down - sampling and coding stages. The down - sampling ratio may be selected given the available data transmission capacity, input video signal statistics, and/or other operational parameters, and may optimally reduce the overall distortion.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 19/59 (2014.01); H04N 19/117 (2014.01); H04N 19/146 (2014.01); H04N 19/147 (2014.01); H04N 19/172 (2014.01); H04N 19/189 (2014.01); H04N 19/196 (2014.01); H04N 19/587 (2014.01); H04N 19/60 (2014.01); H04N 19/85 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 19/59 (2014.11); H04N 19/117 (2014.11); H04N 19/147 (2013.01); H04N 19/172 (2013.01); H04N 19/189 (2014.11); H04N 19/196 (2014.11); H04N 19/587 (2014.11); H04N 19/85 (2014.11); H04N 19/146 (2014.11); H04N 19/60 (2014.11)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2012058394A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2012058394 A1 20120503; AU 2011319844 A1 20130613; CN 103283227 A 20130904; EP 2633685 A1 20130904; KR 20130105870 A 20130926

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-03 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20160325

2016-03-25 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2014-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140717

2014-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 19/196 20140101ALI20140429BHEP

2014-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 19/117 20140101ALI20140429BHEP

2014-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 19/172 20140101ALI20140429BHEP

2014-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 19/189 20140101ALI20140429BHEP

2014-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 19/147 20140101ALI20140429BHEP

2014-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 19/85 20140101ALI20140429BHEP

2014-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 19/587 20140101ALI20140429BHEP

2014-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 19/60 20140101ALI20140429BHEP

2014-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 19/146 20140101ALI20140429BHEP

2014-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 19/59 20140101AFI20140429BHEP

2014-02-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2013-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130523

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR