Global Patent Index - EP 2633688 A1

EP 2633688 A1 2013-09-04 - METHOD FOR GENERATION OF THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGES ENCRUSTING A GRAPHIC OBJECT IN THE IMAGE AND AN ASSOCIATED DISPLAY DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR GENERATION OF THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGES ENCRUSTING A GRAPHIC OBJECT IN THE IMAGE AND AN ASSOCIATED DISPLAY DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER BILDER MIT EINEM EINGEBETTETEN GRAFISCHEN OBJEKT IM BILD UND ZUGEHÖRIGE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ POUR GÉNÉRER DES IMAGES EN TROIS DIMENSIONS EN INCRUSTANT UN OBJET GRAPHIQUE DANS L'IMAGE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ASSOCIÉ

Publication

EP 2633688 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 11775942 A

Priority

  • FR 1058966 A
  • EP 2011068698 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012055892A1] The invention consists in a method for generation of 3D image signals. A graphic object is inserted in said image at a determined depth. A frame of a determined thickness surrounds the object to be inserted. A transition zone is defined by the frame around the inserted graphic object. The depths of image elements of the transition zone vary progressively from the external edge to the internal edge of the frame of the graphic object to be inserted. The present invention also relates to a device for generation of said display signals.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06T 19/20 (2013.01); H04N 13/156 (2018.05); H04N 13/183 (2018.05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2012055892 A1 20120503; CN 103202024 A 20130710; CN 103202024 B 20160504; EP 2633688 A1 20130904; EP 2633688 B1 20180502; JP 2013545184 A 20131219; JP 5902701 B2 20160413; KR 20130139271 A 20131220; US 2013207971 A1 20130815; ZA 201302757 B 20140625

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-30 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602011048071

2018-05-17 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 602011048071

2018-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-05-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 996466 T

- Effective date: 20180515

2018-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2018-05-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-12-27 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171127

2017-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING DTV

2015-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20151103

2014-05-30 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1189316

2014-02-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2013-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130411

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR