Global Patent Index - EP 2633744 A1

EP 2633744 A1 2013-09-04 - FLEXIBLE PRINTED CIRCUITS

Title (en)

FLEXIBLE PRINTED CIRCUITS

Title (de)

FLEXIBLE LEITERPLATTEN

Title (fr)

CIRCUITS IMPRIMÉS SOUPLES

Publication

EP 2633744 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 11767442 A

Priority

  • IB 2010003234 W
  • EP 2011067662 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012055696A1] A flexible printed circuit for a contact- communication device, comprises: -a flexible substrate (6) having opposed first and second faces (6a, 6b), -electrical contacts (7a-7h) patterned on the first face (6a), electrical zones (13a-13h) patterned also on the first face (6a), the zones being associated to contacts, -an electrical path (14a-14h) patterned on the second face (6b) and electrically connected both to a zone and an associated contact.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 1/11 (2006.01); H05K 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05K 1/118 (2013.01); H05K 1/116 (2013.01); H05K 3/3436 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2012055696A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2012055696 A1 20120503; EP 2633744 A1 20130904

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150924

2015-06-10 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150513

2015-04-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H05K 1/11 20060101AFI20150313BHEP

2015-04-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H05K 3/34 20060101ALI20150313BHEP

2014-02-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2013-12-27 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1183589

2013-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130419

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR