Global Patent Index - EP 2633785 A1

EP 2633785 A1 2013-09-04 - Articles holder, specially sport equipments

Title (en)

Articles holder, specially sport equipments

Title (de)

Halter für Gegenstände, insbesondere Sportgeräte

Title (fr)

Supports d'articles, particulièrement des équipements de sport

Publication

EP 2633785 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 13153166 A

Priority

DE 102012101662 A

Abstract (en)

The holder (100) comprises a carrier (102) whose shape is adapted to shape of a to-be-held object. An attachment element (101) is provided for attaching the holder at a wall. A cage space is provided by the carrier, for receiving the to-be-held object. Two legs (105,106) are connected with the attachment element over two parallel extending arcs that are limited by the cage space. An independent claim is included for holding system.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Halter (100) für Gegenstände wie beispielsweise Helme (1), welcher einen Träger (102) umfasst, der in seiner Form dem zu haltenden Gegenstand angepasst ist. Weiterhin hat der Halter mindestens ein Befestigungselement (101), mit welchem er an einer Wand oder dergleichen angebracht werden kann.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/08 (2006.01); A63B 71/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/0823 (2013.01); A63B 47/00 (2013.01); A63B 71/0045 (2013.01); A63B 2102/04 (2015.10); A63B 2102/16 (2015.10)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2633785 A1 20130904; DE 102012101662 A1 20130829

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151027

2015-07-15 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150616

2014-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140915

2014-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140110

2014-02-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME