Global Patent Index - EP 2633917 A2

EP 2633917 A2 2013-09-04 - Thrust centrifuge and method for operating same

Title (en)

Thrust centrifuge and method for operating same

Title (de)

Schubzentrifuge und Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Schubzentrifuge

Title (fr)

Centrifugeuse à poussoir et procédé de fonctionnement d’une centrifugeuse à poussoir

Publication

EP 2633917 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 13155965 A

Priority

DE 102012101787 A

Abstract (en)

The push centrifuge (1) has a filter drum (3) with a longitudinal axis, around which the filter drum is rotatable, and a filter drum body (7) which comprises an inner circumferential surface (9) and an outer circumferential surface (11). The inner circumferential surface is defined by a filter unit (33). Another filter drum body (13) comprises another inner circumferential surface (15) and another outer circumferential surface (17), where the latter inner circumferential surface is defined by another filter unit (47). A push floor (25) is arranged in the filter drum. The former filter drum body is arranged radially directly adjacent to the push floor. A relative movement mechanism (27) is provided by which the push floor and the two filter drum bodies are moved axially to and fro relative to each other in the direction of the longitudinal axis (5) of the filter drum. An independent claim is included for operating a push centrifuge.

Abstract (de)

Schubzentrifuge (1), aufweisend eine Filtertrommel (3) mit einer Längsachse (5), um welche die Filtertrommel (3) rotierbar ist, einem ersten Filtertrommelkörper (7), der eine von einem ersten Filtermittel (33) definierte Innenumfangsfläche (9) und eine Außenumfangsfläche (11) aufweist, und einem zweiten Filtertrommelkörper (13), der eine von einem zweiten Filtermittel (47) definierte Innenumfangsfläche (15) und eine Außenumfangsfläche (17) aufweist, einen Schubboden (5), der in der Filtertrommel (3) angeordnet ist, wobei der erste Filtertrommelkörper (3) dem Schubboden (25) radial unmittelbar benachbart angeordnet ist, und einen Relativbewegungsmechanismus (27), von welchem der Schubboden (25) und der zweite Filtertrommelkörper (13) gemeinsam und der erste Filtertrommelkörper (7) in Richtung der Längsachse (5) der Filtertrommel (3) relativ zueinander axial hin und her bewegbar sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 3/02 (2006.01); B04B 7/18 (2006.01); B04B 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 3/02 (2013.01); B04B 7/18 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2633917 A2 20130904; EP 2633917 A3 20170426; EP 2633917 B1 20180411; DE 102012101787 A1 20130905; EP 2633918 A2 20130904; EP 2633918 A3 20170426; EP 2633918 B1 20180411

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-09 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502013009873

2018-05-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2018-04-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 987422 T

- Effective date: 20180415

2018-04-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2018-04-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2018-03-28 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180220

2018-02-21 [INTC] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT (DELETED)

2017-10-11 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170914

2017-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20170704

2017-08-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME

2017-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B04B 7/18 20060101ALI20170317BHEP

2017-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B04B 11/04 20060101ALI20170317BHEP

2017-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B04B 3/02 20060101AFI20170317BHEP

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME