Global Patent Index - EP 2633963 A1

EP 2633963 A1 2013-09-04 - Hot wire cutting device

Title (en)

Hot wire cutting device

Title (de)

Heissdrahtschneidvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupe à fil chaud

Publication

EP 2633963 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 13001059 A

Priority

DE 102012006238 A

Abstract (en)

The hot wire cutting device (1) comprises a base frame (2), and a rectangular frame structure of interconnected groove profiles (3-5). An upper angular profile section (11) is formed at the upper edge of the base frame and a lower angular profile section (16) is formed at the lower edge of the base frame. An upper guide rail (23) is pivotally mounted at the upper edge of the base frame or on the upper angular profile section and a lower guide rail is pivotally mounted at the lower edge of the base frame or on the lower angular profile section.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Heissdrahtschneidvorrichtung (1) zum thermischen Trennen von Werkstücken, insbesondere aus Kunststoffschaum oder Fasermaterial, wobei erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen ist, dass ein Grundgestell (2) der Heissdrahtschneidvorrichtung (1) als insbesondere rechteckige Rahmenstruktur aus miteinander verbundenen Nutprofilen (3, 4, 5, 6) gebildet ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26F 3/12 (2006.01); B26D 3/00 (2006.01); B26D 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 3/12 (2013.01); B26D 3/006 (2013.01); B26D 7/2614 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 102008044724 A1 20100304 - STORCH MALERWERKZEUGE & PROFIG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2633963 A1 20130904

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151002

2015-06-17 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150522

2014-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140415

2014-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140227

2014-04-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME