Global Patent Index - EP 2634112 A1

EP 2634112 A1 2013-09-04 - Refillable dispensing container

Title (en)

Refillable dispensing container

Title (de)

Wiederbefüllbarer Ausgabebehälter

Title (fr)

Récipient de sortie pouvant être rempli de nouveau

Publication

EP 2634112 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 13155562 A

Priority

DE 102012101635 A

Abstract (en)

The filling device (1) has an actuation element for opening a filling valve (11) of an output container (6) when connecting the output container with a filling pipe (9). A non-return valve has a valve seat, a closure body and a spring element, which prestresses the closure body in position closing the non-return valve. An actuation section is engaged with the actuation element so that the actuation element move the closure body against the spring force of the spring element from the position closing the non-return valve into the position opening the non-return valve. An independent claim is included for a combination of a refillable output container for a fluid.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Befüllgerät (1) zum Befüllen eines Ausgabebehälters mit einem Fluid (7) mit einem Füllstutzen (9), der ein Rückschlagventil (16) aufweist, wobei das Rückschlagventil (16) einen Betätigungsabschnitt (22, 36) zum Öffnen des Rückschlagventils (16) durch ein Betätigungselement (23, 42) eines Befüllventils (11) des Ausgabebehälters (6) aufweist. Um ein Befüllgerät sowie eine Kombination aus einem Ausgabebehälter und einem Befüllgerät bereitzustellen, welche ein Nachbefüllen eines teilweise mit Fluid gefüllten Ausgabebehälters zuverlässig ermöglichen, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, dass der Füllstutzen (9) ein Betätigungselement (23, 42) zum Öffnen des Befüllventils (11) des Ausgabebehälters (6) beim Verbinden des Ausgabebehälters (6) mit dem Füllstutzen (9) aufweist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/42 (2006.01); B65D 30/00 (2006.01); B65D 30/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 31/00 (2013.01); B65B 3/32 (2013.01); B65B 31/003 (2013.01); B65B 31/047 (2013.01); B65D 83/42 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0662431 B1 19990728 - WUERTH ADOLF GMBH & CO KG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2634112 A1 20130904; DE 102012101635 A1 20130829; US 2013220482 A1 20130829

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160203

2015-10-21 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150922

2015-08-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 30/00 20060101ALI20150723BHEP

2015-08-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 83/42 20060101AFI20150723BHEP

2015-08-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 30/20 20060101ALI20150723BHEP

2014-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140226

2014-04-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME