Global Patent Index - EP 2634332 A1

EP 2634332 A1 2013-09-04 - Lock for a window, door or similar

Title (en)

Lock for a window, door or similar

Title (de)

Schloss für eine Tür, ein Fenster oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Serrure pour une porte, une fenêtre ou analogue

Publication

EP 2634332 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 12157899 A

Priority

EP 12157899 A

Abstract (en)

The lock (1) has a common locking transmission element (3) that is provided with the inner locking mechanism (7) and the outer locking mechanism (11). The bolt (8) with deactivated outer latch drive (5) is moved from a locked state into an unlocked state by inner latch actuating element (6). The outer latch drive is decoupled between the common locking transmission element and the outer latch actuator. The common locking transmission element is deactivated in the outer latch drive by the unlocking movement of the inner latch actuating element.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schloss (1) für eine Tür, ein Fenster oder dergleichen weist einen Riegel (8) mit einem von einer Rauminnenseite aus betätigbaren inneren Riegelantrieb (4) und einem von einer Raumaußenseite aus betätigbaren äußeren Riegelantrieb (5) auf. Der innere Riegelantrieb (4) umfasst ein inneres Riegel-Betätigungsorgan (6) und ein inneres Riegelgetriebe (7) zwischen dem inneren Riegel-Betätigungsorgan (6) und dem Riegel (8). Entsprechend weist der äußere Riegelantrieb (5) ein äußeres Riegel-Betätigungsorgan (10) und ein zwischen diesem und dem Riegel (8) angeordnetes äußeres Riegelgetriebe (11) auf. Für das innere Riegelgetriebe (7) und das äußere Riegelgetriebe (11) ist wenigstens ein gemeinsames Riegelgetriebeelement (3) vorgesehen. Der äußere Riegelantrieb (5) kann durch Betätigen einer Schalteinrichtung (28) deaktiviert werden. Der Riegel (8) ist bei deaktiviertem äußerem Riegelantrieb (5) mittels des inneren Riegel-Betätigungsorgans (6) aus einem Verriegelungszustand in einen Entriegelungszustand überführbar, indem der äußere Riegelantrieb (5) zwischen dem gemeinsamen Riegelgetriebeelement (3) und dem äußeren Riegel-Betätigungs-organ (10) entkoppelt von dem gemeinsamen Riegelgetriebeelement (3) deaktiviert ist und indem das gemeinsame Riegelgetriebeelement (3) bei deaktiviertem äußerem Riegelantrieb (5) mittels des inneren Riegel-Betätigungsorgans (6) mit einer l=ntriegelungsbewegung antreibbar ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/10 (2006.01); E05B 59/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/1086 (2013.01); E05B 59/00 (2013.01); E05B 63/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 1672153 A1 20060621 - ROTO FRANK AG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2634332 A1 20130904; EP 2634332 B1 20170503

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-10-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-10-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-10-31 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170803

2017-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170804

2017-09-25 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2017-09-06 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-06-14 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502012010216

2017-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-05-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 890178 T

- Effective date: 20170515

2017-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2016-12-14 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20161116

2016-12-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 65/10 20060101AFI20161108BHEP

2016-12-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 63/16 20060101ALN20161108BHEP

2016-12-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 59/00 20060101ALI20161108BHEP

2016-11-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 65/10 20060101AFI20161019BHEP

2016-11-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 59/00 20060101ALI20161019BHEP

2016-11-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 63/16 20060101ALN20161019BHEP

2014-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140423

2014-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140226

2014-04-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME