Global Patent Index - EP 2634349 A2

EP 2634349 A2 2013-09-04 - Construction site gate

Title (en)

Construction site gate

Title (de)

Baustellentür

Title (fr)

Porte de chantier

Publication

EP 2634349 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 13000986 A

Priority

DE 102012003891 A

Abstract (en)

The door (1) comprises a closure device (11) that is adjusted between a closing position and an open position for closing and releasing a building door opening (5). The closure device is arranged in a portable door box (2) and is extended as a covering unit for closing/locking the building door opening to cover size. The cover unit is formed by a tarpaulin, film or tissue.

Abstract (de)

Baustellentür (1) zum Verschließen einer Gebaudewand-Türöffnung (5) mittels einer Verschlusseinrichtung (11), die zwischen einer die Gebäudewand-Türöffnung (5) abdeckenden Schließstellung und einer die Gebäudewand-Türöffnung (5) freigebenden Offenstellung verstellbar ist, gekennzeichnet durch einen transportablen Türkasten (2), in dem eine als Verschlusseinrichtung vorgesehene Abdeckeinheit (11) größenreduziert aufgenommen und zum Verschließen der Gebäudewand-Türöffnung (5) auf Abdeckgröße ausfahrbar ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/02 (2006.01); E04G 21/24 (2006.01); E06B 9/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/025 (2013.01); E06B 9/11 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29817064 U1 19981217 - JOH JOS VOLBERG GMBH & CO KG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2634349 A2 20130904; EP 2634349 A3 20141224; EP 2634349 B1 20170426; DE 102012003891 A1 20130829; PL 2634349 T3 20170929

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170426

2017-10-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170426

2017-10-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170426

2017-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170727

2017-10-31 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170726

2017-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170426

2017-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170426

2017-09-11 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2017-08-30 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20170426

2017-06-08 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502013007050

2017-05-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-05-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 888042 T

- Effective date: 20170515

2017-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-04-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-01-11 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20161214

2016-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160229

2015-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20141218

2015-02-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2014-12-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2014-12-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME

2014-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/11 20060101ALI20141120BHEP

2014-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 5/02 20060101AFI20141120BHEP

2014-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04G 21/24 20060101ALI20141120BHEP

2013-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME