EP 2635300 A4 20140402 - DOCK-AND-LOCK (DNL) CONSTRUCTS FOR HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS (HIV) THERAPY
Title (en)
DOCK-AND-LOCK (DNL) CONSTRUCTS FOR HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS (HIV) THERAPY
Title (de)
DOCK-AND-LOCK (DNL)-KONSTRUKTE FÜR EINE THERAPIE GEGEN DEN HUMANEN IMMUNSCHWÄCHEVIRUS (HIV)
Title (fr)
PRODUITS DE RECOMBINAISON DOCK-AND-LOCK (DNL) POUR THÉRAPIE CONTRE LE VIRUS D'IMMUNODÉFICIENCE HUMAINE (VIH)
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201161487956 P 20110519
- US 201113036820 A 20110228
- US 201113021302 A 20110204
- US 96893610 A 20101215
- US 94953610 A 20101118
- US 41459210 P 20101117
- US 40974010 P 20101103
- US 2011059056 W 20111103
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2012061548A1] The present invention concerns methods and compositions for treatment of HIV infection in a subject, utilizing a DNL complex comprising at least one anti-HIV therapeutic agent, attached to an antibody, antibody fragment or PEG. In a preferred embodiment, the antibody or fragment binds to an antigen selected from gp120, gp41, CD4 and CCR5. In a more preferred embodiment the antibody is P4/D10 or 2G12, although other anti-HIV antibodies are known and may be utilized. In a most preferred embodiment, the anti-HIV therapeutic agent is a fusion inhibitor, such as T20, T61, T651, T1249, T2635, CP32M or T-1444, although other anti-HIV therapeutic agents are known and may be utilized. The DNL complex may be administered alone or may be co-administered with one or more additional anti-HIV therapeutic agents.
IPC 8 full level
A61K 38/21 (2006.01); A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C07K 16/30 (2006.01); C07K 16/46 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61K 47/6803 (2017.08); A61K 47/6807 (2017.08); A61K 47/6809 (2017.08); A61K 47/6811 (2017.08); A61K 47/6841 (2017.08); A61P 35/00 (2018.01); A61P 37/00 (2018.01); C07K 16/00 (2013.01); C07K 2317/30 (2013.01); C07K 2317/90 (2013.01); C07K 2319/01 (2013.01); C07K 2319/73 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 2010104589 A1 20100429 - GOVINDAN SERENGULAM V [US], et al
- [X] US 2008171067 A1 20080717 - GOVINDAN SERENGULAM V [US], et al
- [X] US 2007140966 A1 20070621 - CHANG CHIEN-HSING [US], et al
- [XA] WO 2007134037 A2 20071122 - IMMUNONOMEDICS INC [US], et al
- [A] US 2010068137 A1 20100318 - CHANG CHIEN-HSING [US], et al
- [A] US 2009060862 A1 20090305 - CHANG CHIEN-HSING [US], et al
- [A] WO 2010017500 A2 20100211 - IMMUNOMEDICS INC [US], et al
- [A] US 2009202487 A1 20090813 - CHANG CHIEN-HSING [US], et al
- [A] WO 2009126558 A1 20091015 - IBC PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al
- [A] US 2007086942 A1 20070419 - CHANG CHIEN H [US], et al
- [A] WO 2007046893 A2 20070426 - IBC PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al
- [A] US 2010196266 A1 20100805 - GOLDENBERG DAVID M [US], et al
- [A] WO 2007075270 A2 20070705 - IBC PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al
- [A] WO 2006107786 A2 20061012 - IBC PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al
- [A] US 2009191225 A1 20090730 - CHANG CHIEN-HSING [US], et al
- [A] WO 2007127219 A2 20071108 - CBR INST FOR BIOMED RES INC [US], et al
- [A] D. M. GOLDENBERG ET AL: "Multifunctional Antibodies by the Dock-and-Lock Method for Improved Cancer Imaging and Therapy by Pretargeting", THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, vol. 49, no. 1, 1 January 2008 (2008-01-01), pages 158 - 163, XP055028152, ISSN: 0161-5505, DOI: 10.2967/jnumed.107.046185
- [AD] SONG E ET AL: "Antibody mediated in vivo delivery of small interfering RNAs via cell-surface receptors", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 23, no. 6, 22 May 2005 (2005-05-22), pages 709 - 717, XP002390626, ISSN: 1087-0156, DOI: 10.1038/NBT1101
- [T] CHIEN-HSING CHANG ET AL: "A Novel Class of Anti-HIV Agents with Multiple Copies of Enfuvirtide Enhances Inhibition of Viral Replication and Cellular Transmission In Vitro", PLOS ONE, vol. 7, no. 7, 23 July 2012 (2012-07-23), pages e41235, XP055103446, ISSN: 1932-6203, DOI: 10.1371/journal.pone.0041235
- See also references of WO 2012061548A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2012061548 A1 20120510; AU 2011323354 A1 20130321; AU 2011323354 B2 20140731; CA 2812442 A1 20120510; CN 103328001 A 20130925; CN 103328001 B 20170215; EP 2635300 A1 20130911; EP 2635300 A4 20140402
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2011059056 W 20111103; AU 2011323354 A 20111103; CA 2812442 A 20111103; CN 201180051294 A 20111103; EP 11838781 A 20111103