Global Patent Index - EP 2635708 A4

EP 2635708 A4 2014-10-29 - ANALYSIS OF FRAGMENTED GENOMIC DNA IN DROPLETS

Title (en)

ANALYSIS OF FRAGMENTED GENOMIC DNA IN DROPLETS

Title (de)

ANALYSE FRAGMENTIERTER GENOMISCHER DNA IN TRÖPFCHEN

Title (fr)

ANALYSE D'ADN GÉNOMIQUE FRAGMENTÉ DANS DES GOUTTELETTES

Publication

EP 2635708 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 11838712 A

Priority

  • US 97682710 A
  • US 40910610 P
  • US 2011058854 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012061442A1] Method of analyzing genomic DNA. Genomic DNA including a target may be obtained. The genomic DNA may be fragmented volitionally to produce fragmented DNA. The fragmented DNA may be passed through a droplet generator to generate aqueous droplets containing the fragmented DNA. An assay may be performed on the droplets to determine a level of the target. In some embodiments, the droplets may contain the genomic DNA at a concentration of at least about five nanograms per microliter, the droplets may be generated at a droplet generation frequency of at least about 50 droplets per second, the droplets may have an average volume of less than about 10 nanoliters per droplet, the droplets may generated at a flow rate of greater than about 50 nanoliters per second, or any combination thereof.

IPC 8 full level

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC

C12Q 1/686 (2013.01)

C-Set

C12Q 1/686 + C12Q 2527/146 + C12Q 2563/159

Citation (search report)

  • [XPY] BENJAMIN J. HINDSON ET AL: "High-Throughput Droplet Digital PCR System for Absolute Quantitation of DNA Copy Number", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 83, no. 22, 28 October 2011 (2011-10-28), pages 8604 - 8610, XP055047554, ISSN: 0003-2700, DOI: 10.1021/ac202028g
  • [Y] RYAN TEWHEY ET AL: "Microdroplet-based PCR enrichment for large-scale targeted sequencing", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 27, no. 11, 1 November 2009 (2009-11-01), pages 1025 - 1031, XP055103848, ISSN: 1087-0156, DOI: 10.1038/nbt.1583
  • [Y] "Application Note: Targeted Sequencing of 4000 Exons Using the RainDance Technologies Sequence Enrichment Assay", APPLICATION NOTE FROM RAINDANCE, 2009, XP055138343
  • [A] ZHISHAN HUA ET AL: "Multiplexed Real-Time Polymerase Chain Reaction on a Digital Microfluidic Platform", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 82, no. 6, 15 March 2010 (2010-03-15), pages 2310 - 2316, XP055138297, ISSN: 0003-2700, DOI: 10.1021/ac902510u
  • See also references of WO 2012061442A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family

WO 2012061442 A1 20120510; AU 2011323507 A1 20130613; CA 2816702 A1 20120510; CN 103443289 A 20131211; EP 2635708 A1 20130911; EP 2635708 A4 20141029; JP 2013541347 A 20131114; SG 190076 A1 20130628