Global Patent Index - EP 2636827 A2

EP 2636827 A2 2013-09-11 - Motor vehicle lock

Title (en)

Motor vehicle lock

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 2636827 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 13001115 A

Priority

DE 202012002175 U

Abstract (en)

The lock has security device (3) which is coupled to functional element (1) with automatic actuation element (4). The security device is provided with blocking element (5) which is moved from normal position into blocking position. The actuation element of the functional element is blocked by blocking element. The functional element is actuated for setting the blocking element in the normal position such that the tilting movement of blocking element with respect to tilting axis is enabled. The blocking element is divided into two lever portions by tilting axis.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Kraftfahrzeugschloss mit einem betätigbaren Funktionselement (1) und einer dem Funktionselement (1) zugeordneten Sicherheitseinrichtung (3), die mit dem Funktionselement (1) gekoppelt oder koppelbar ist, um einer selbsttätigen Betätigungsbewegung (4) des Funktionselements (1) durch im Crashfall auftretende Crashbeschleunigungen entgegenzuwirken, wobei die Sicherheitseinrichtung (3) ein Blockierelement (5) aufweist, das als federelastischer Draht oder Streifen ausgestaltet ist und aus einer Normalstellung heraus in eine Blockierstellung auslenkbar ist, in der eine Betätigungsbewegung (4) des Funktionselements (1) durch das Blockierelement (5) blockierbar ist, wobei durch im Crashfall auftretende Crashbeschleunigungen eine Verstellung des Blockierelements (5) in die Blockierstellung auslösbar ist, wobei dem Blockierelement (5) eine Rastanordnung (6) zugeordnet ist, die bei einer Verstellung des Blockierelements (5) in die Blockierstellung einrastet und wobei die eingerastete Rastanordnung (6) das Blockierelement (5) in der Blockierstellung hält, wobei das Blockierelement (5) durch eine Betätigung des Funktionselements (1), die Rastanordnung (6) lösend, in die Normalstellung rückstellbar ist. Es wird vorgeschlagen, dass eine Betätigung des Funktionselements (1) für die Rückstellung des Blockierelements (5) in die Normalstellung zunächst eine Kippbewegung (8) des Blockierelements (5) um eine Kippachse (7) erzeugt, welche Kippachse (7) das Blockierelement (5) in zwei Hebelabschnitte (9, 10) teilt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/06 (2013.01); E05B 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

DE 202012002175 U1 20130612; EP 2636827 A2 20130911; EP 2636827 A3 20161130

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20170530

2017-07-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-11-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 65/12 00000000AFI20161024BHEP

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 15/04 20060101ALN20161024BHEP

2016-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 65/12 00000000AFI20160429BHEP

2016-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 15/04 20060101ALN20160429BHEP

2013-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WITTELSBUERGER, MICHAEL

2013-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KLEMMSTEIN, THOMAS

2013-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BALS, JOCHEN

2013-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DOERSCHELLN, TORSTEN

2013-09-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUCHELI, MARTIN

2013-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME