Global Patent Index - EP 2638275 A1

EP 2638275 A1 2013-09-18 - GAS DISTRIBUTION MANIFOLD AND GAS INDUCTION MODULE THEREOF

Title (en)

GAS DISTRIBUTION MANIFOLD AND GAS INDUCTION MODULE THEREOF

Title (de)

GASVERTEILERVORRICHTUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDES GASSAUGMODUL

Title (fr)

COLLECTEUR DE REPARTITION DE GAZ ET MODULE D'ADMISSION DE GAZ CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 2638275 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 11778930 A

Priority

  • FR 1059205 A
  • EP 2011069576 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012062715A1] Manifold (8) for distributing gases to the inlet ducts of a motor vehicle combustion engine, said inlet ducts being distributed in at least two distant groups, each duct of one group feeding one and the same cylinder of the engine as a duct of the other group, said manifold (8) comprising: - a manifold casing (10) through which a flow of inlet gas can pass; an injection duct (14) for injecting a flow of recirculated exhaust gas into the flow of inlet gas, the casing being capable of directing the flow of inlet gas and the flow of recirculated exhaust gas toward the inlet ducts of the engine and the injection duct (14) being positioned inside the manifold casing (10) so as to be able to be positioned between the two groups of inlet ducts.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/116 (2006.01); F02M 26/17 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F03D 80/70 (2016.05); F02B 29/0475 (2013.01); F02M 26/17 (2016.02); F02M 26/19 (2016.02); F02M 35/10222 (2013.01); F02M 35/116 (2013.01); Y02T 10/121 (2013.01); Y02T 10/146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2012062715A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2967215 A1 20120511; FR 2967215 B1 20160101; CN 103443439 A 20131211; CN 103443439 B 20170825; EP 2638275 A1 20130918; JP 2013541674 A 20131114; JP 5985490 B2 20160906; US 2013291842 A1 20131107; US 9441578 B2 20160913; WO 2012062715 A1 20120518

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-08 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171010

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 26/17 20160101ALI20170914BHEP

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 35/116 20060101AFI20170914BHEP

2017-04-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20170322

2014-02-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2013-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130506

2013-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR