Global Patent Index - EP 2638377 A1

EP 2638377 A1 2013-09-18 - TEST FOR LEAKTIGHTNESS OF A PIPELINE SYSTEM FOR FIREFIGHTING SYSTEMS

Title (en)

TEST FOR LEAKTIGHTNESS OF A PIPELINE SYSTEM FOR FIREFIGHTING SYSTEMS

Title (de)

DICHTHEITSPRÜFUNG VON ROHRLEITUNGSSYSTEM FÜR BRANDBEKÄMPFUNGSANLAGEN

Title (fr)

CONTRÔLE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ DE SYSTÈMES DE TUYAUTERIE POUR DES INSTALLATIONS DE LUTTE CONTRE LES INCENDIES

Publication

EP 2638377 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 11708475 A

Priority

  • DE 102010050505 A
  • EP 2011053975 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012062484A1] Method and system for testing for leaktightness of dry pipeline systems (2) in firefighting systems, in particular in rail vehicles, comprising generating gas overpressure in the pipeline system (2), capturing an actual gas pressure and/or an actual gas volume flow in the pipeline system (2), comparing the captured actual gas pressure with a prespecified gas pressure and/or comparing the captured actual gas volume flow with a prespecified gas volume flow. In order to detect a leakage, it is proposed that a warning signal be emitted if the actual gas pressure should deviate from the prespecified gas pressure.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01M 3/28 (2006.01); A62C 37/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01M 3/2815 (2013.01); A62C 37/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2012062484A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102010050505 A1 20120510; EP 2638377 A1 20130918; WO 2012062484 A1 20120518

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160113

2015-09-30 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150902

2015-03-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150223

2014-02-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2013-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130507

2013-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR