Global Patent Index - EP 2639396 A2

EP 2639396 A2 2013-09-18 - Seal part, and frame assembly

Title (en)

Seal part, and frame assembly

Title (de)

Dichtungsformteil, sowie Rahmenanordnung

Title (fr)

Pièce d'étanchéité et agencement de cadre

Publication

EP 2639396 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 13159406 A

Priority

DE 102012005196 A

Abstract (en)

The part (1) has two contact surfaces attached at a surface element and a frame, respectively, where the part exhibits a partial elongated shape. Two apertures (16, 17) are formed in side surfaces (13, 14) of a channel (15), respectively. The channel extends in a longitudinal direction of the part. The part is partially made of plastic such as ethylene propylene diene rubber (EPDM) or silicone. The channel and the apertures are arranged in a leg (18). A glazing rebate retains an edge area of the surface element and designed as a U-shaped receiving area. An independent claim is also included for a frame assembly.

Abstract (de)

Dichtungsformteil (1) für eine Rahmenanordnung, umfassend einen Rahmen (3) mit einem in dem Rahmen aufgenommenen Flächenelement (2), wobei das Dichtungsformteil eine erste Anlagefläche (10) zur Anlage an dem Flächenelement (2), eine zweite Anlagefläche (11) zur Anlage an dem Rahmen (3), sowie eine erste Seitenfläche (13) und eine zweie Seitenfläche (14) umfasst, wobei das Dichtungsformteil (1) einen Kanal (15) aufweist, wobei der Kanal eine erste Öffnung (16) in der ersten Seitenfläche (13) und eine zweite Öffnung (17) in der zweiten Seitenfläche (14) aufweist, sowie Rahmenanordnung, umfassend einen Rahmen (3) mit einem in dem Rahmen aufgenommenen Flächenelement (2), wobei ein Dichtungsformteil (1) gemäß mindestens einem der Ansprüche 1 bis 6 zwischen dem Rahmen (3) und dem Flächenelement (2) angeordnet ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/14 (2013.01); E06B 2007/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2639396 A2 20130918; EP 2639396 A3 20160831; EP 2639396 A8 20131204; EP 2639396 B1 20171213

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171213

2018-05-31 [PG25 RS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171213

2018-05-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171213

2018-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180313

2018-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180314

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 6

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180328

- Year of fee payment: 6

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 6

2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171213

2018-04-30 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180313

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171213

2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171213

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 6

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 6

2018-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 6

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 6

2018-04-25 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 6

2018-02-21 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2018-01-18 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502013008992

2018-01-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-12-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 954548 T

- Effective date: 20171215

2017-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-12-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-09-13 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170816

2017-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-04-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2016-08-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME

2016-08-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 7/14 20060101AFI20160726BHEP

2014-12-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUECK GMBH & CO. KG

2013-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RAITHEL, CARL

2013-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MEISTER, WOLFGANG

2013-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VOLKELT, THOMAS

2013-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME