Global Patent Index - EP 2639512 A2

EP 2639512 A2 2013-09-18 - Household appliance with a lambda probe and method for operating a domestic appliance with a lambda probe

Title (en)

Household appliance with a lambda probe and method for operating a domestic appliance with a lambda probe

Title (de)

Haushaltsgerät mit einer Lambda-Sonde bzw. Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Haushaltsgeräts mit einer Lambda-Sonde

Title (fr)

Appareil ménager avec une sonde lambda ou procédé de fonctionnement d'un appareil ménager avec une sonde lambda

Publication

EP 2639512 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 13157931 A

Priority

DE 102012204224 A

Abstract (en)

The appliance (101) has a lambda probe (102) that is connected with a down converter (109), or the lambda probe comprises the down converter. A sensor system (107) is arranged upstream of components of the lambda probe, where the sensor system comprises the down converter. An output voltage of the down converter is set as a probe voltage (U out) that is applied to a probe heater (104) of the down converter. A switch of the down converter is arranged with a frequency lying in a range between 20 KHz and 150 KHz. An independent claim is also included for a method for operating a lambda probe.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Haushaltsgerät, insbesondere Gargerät (101) mit einer Lambda-Sonde (102) bzw. auch ein Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Lambda-Sonde (102), wobei der Lambda-Sonde (102) ein Tiefsetzer (109) vorgeschaltet ist, so dass eine herkömmliche Lambda-Sonde (102) aus anderen technischen Gebieten auch in dem Haushaltsgerät mit für die Lambda-Sonde (102) zu hoher Versorgungsspannung (U in ) einsetzbar ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/085 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2639512 A2 20130918; EP 2639512 A3 20140108; DE 102012204224 A1 20130919

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160906

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2014-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140708

2014-08-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2014-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2014-01-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME

2014-01-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24C 7/08 20060101AFI20131202BHEP

2013-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME