Global Patent Index - EP 2639513 A1

EP 2639513 A1 2013-09-18 - Cooking device

Title (en)

Cooking device

Title (de)

Gargerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de cuisson

Publication

EP 2639513 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 13158081 A

Priority

DE 102012204233 A

Abstract (en)

The cooking appliance (1) has a cooking appliance muffle, a cooking appliance door (10) and a glazing countertop of a kitchen. An optical element is provided at the glazing for improving the visibility in the cooking appliance muffle. The optical element is aligned in a muffle interior (20). Two cooking supports are located in adjacent guides (30) of the muffle. A corresponding section is defined for each cooking support receptacle.

Abstract (de)

An einem Gargerät (1) mit einer Gargerätemuffel (5), einer Gargerätetür (10) und einer Verglasung (12, 14) der Gargerätetür ist an der Verglasung ein optisches Element (15, 15') zur Verbesserung der Sicht in die Gargerätemuffel (20) vorgesehen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2639513 A1 20130918; DE 102012204233 A1 20130919

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20170317

2015-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150806

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2014-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140318

2014-04-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME