Global Patent Index - EP 2640351 A2

EP 2640351 A2 2013-09-25 - USE OF ASCORBIC ACID DERIVATIVES FOR DYEING KERATINOUS FIBERS

Title (en)

USE OF ASCORBIC ACID DERIVATIVES FOR DYEING KERATINOUS FIBERS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON ASCORBINSÄUREDERIVATEN ZUR FÄRBUNG VON KERATINHALTIGEN FASERN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE DÉRIVÉS D'ACIDE ASCORBIQUE POUR TEINTER DES FIBRES KÉRATINIQUES

Publication

EP 2640351 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 11773197 A

Priority

  • DE 102010051725 A
  • EP 2011005269 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US8702813B2] The invention relates to the use of specific ascorbic acid derivatives for dyeing keratin-containing fibers or as direct dyes for the preparation of a composition for dyeing keratin-containing fibers, and to methods for dyeing keratin-containing fibers, in particular for dyeing human hair.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/67 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61Q 5/02 (2006.01); A61Q 5/06 (2006.01); A61Q 5/10 (2006.01); A61Q 5/12 (2006.01); D06P 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/4973 (2013.01); A61K 8/676 (2013.01); A61Q 5/065 (2013.01); A61Q 5/10 (2013.01); D06P 1/32 (2013.01); A61Q 5/02 (2013.01); A61Q 5/06 (2013.01); A61Q 5/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102010051725 A1 20120524; EP 2640351 A2 20130925; JP 2013544247 A 20131212; US 2013228192 A1 20130905; US 8702813 B2 20140422; WO 2012065671 A2 20120524; WO 2012065671 A3 20120726

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170103

2016-09-14 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160819

2016-08-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06P 1/32 20060101ALI20160718BHEP

2016-08-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/10 20060101ALI20160718BHEP

2016-08-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/49 20060101ALI20160718BHEP

2016-08-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/02 20060101ALI20160718BHEP

2016-08-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/06 20060101ALI20160718BHEP

2016-08-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/67 20060101AFI20160718BHEP

2016-08-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/12 20060101ALI20160718BHEP

2014-02-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2013-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130412

2013-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR