Global Patent Index - EP 2640786 A1

EP 2640786 A1 2013-09-25 - METHOD FOR PREPARING AQUEOUS SUSPENSIONS OF MINERAL MATERIALS USING AMINES IN COMBINATION WITH VINYL CARBOXYLIC POLYMERS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PREPARING AQUEOUS SUSPENSIONS OF MINERAL MATERIALS USING AMINES IN COMBINATION WITH VINYL CARBOXYLIC POLYMERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WÄSSRIGEN SUSPENSIONEN AUS MINERALISCHEN MATERIALIEN MIT AMINEN IN KOMBINATION MIT VINYLCARBONSÄUREPOLYMEREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE SUSPENSIONS AQUEUSE DE MATIERES MINERALES AU MOYEN D'AMINES EN COMBINAISON AVEC DES POLYMERES VINYL-CARBOXYLIQUES

Publication

EP 2640786 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 11801824 A

Priority

  • EP 10014783 A
  • US 41590710 P
  • IB 2011002724 W
  • EP 11801824 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2455429A1] Preparing an aqueous suspension of mineral material comprises: (a) providing at least one mineral material; (b) preparing an aqueous suspension comprising at least the mineral material; (c) grinding the mineral material of the aqueous suspension; and (d) optionally selecting and/or concentrating the aqueous suspension before dispersing the obtained concentrate. Preparing an aqueous suspension of mineral material comprises: (a) providing at least one mineral material; (b) preparing an aqueous suspension comprising at least the mineral material; (c) grinding the mineral material of the aqueous suspension; and (d) optionally selecting and/or concentrating the aqueous suspension before dispersing the obtained concentrate, where at least one amine and a vinyl-carboxylic acid polymer totally neutralized by a neutralizing agent different from the amine, is added between the steps (a), (b) and/or (c) or during step (c) or after step (c) during or after dispersing the obtained concentrate.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09C 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08K 3/26 (2013.01); C08K 3/28 (2013.01); C09C 1/021 (2013.01); C01P 2004/61 (2013.01); C01P 2006/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2012066410A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2455429 A1 20120523; EP 2455429 B1 20130814; AR 083892 A1 20130327; AU 2011330888 A1 20130704; AU 2011330888 B2 20150716; BR 112013012092 A2 20160816; CA 2816733 A1 20120524; CA 2816733 C 20170516; CL 2013001346 A1 20131104; CN 103328585 A 20130925; CN 103328585 B 20150722; DK 2455429 T3 20131125; EP 2640786 A1 20130925; ES 2435649 T3 20131220; HR P20131080 T1 20131206; IL 226365 A 20180131; IL 226365 D0 20130731; JP 2014502298 A 20140130; JP 2017214574 A 20171207; JP 6208013 B2 20171004; KR 20140002658 A 20140108; MX 2013005153 A 20130702; PT 2455429 E 20131107; RS 53031 B 20140430; RU 2013127662 A 20150110; RU 2643548 C2 20180202; SI EP2455429 T1 20131231; TW 201235421 A 20120901; TW I496843 B 20150821; US 2014148538 A1 20140529; US 9029448 B2 20150512; UY 33737 A 20120629; WO 2012066410 A1 20120524; ZA 201303415 B 20140730

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140925

2014-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140514

2014-02-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2013-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OMYA INTERNATIONAL AG

2013-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130515

2013-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR