Global Patent Index - EP 2640818 A1

EP 2640818 A1 2013-09-25 - STABILIZED LIQUID SURFACTANT COMPOSITION COMPRISING ENZYM

Title (en)

STABILIZED LIQUID SURFACTANT COMPOSITION COMPRISING ENZYM

Title (de)

STABILISIERTE FLÜSSIGE ENZYMHALTIGE TENSIDZUBEREITUNG

Title (fr)

PRÉPARATION LIQUIDE D'AGENTS TENSIOACTIFS STABILISÉE ET CONTENANT DES ENZYMES

Publication

EP 2640818 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 11779166 A

Priority

  • DE 102010043934 A
  • EP 2011069168 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012065839A1] The aim of the invention is to stabilize a hydrolytic enzyme in a liquid surfactant preparation. Said aim is achieved by using a component stabilizing the hydrolytic enzyme, said component comprising boric acid, propylene glycol and a phenylboronic acid derivative having the structural formula (I), in which R is hydrogen, a hydroxyl group, a C1-C6 alkyl group, a substituted C1-C6 alkyl group, a C1-C6 alkenyl group or a substituted C1-C6 alkenyl group.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/386 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/38663 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102010043934 A1 20120516; EP 2640818 A1 20130925; EP 2640818 B1 20180425; US 2013252315 A1 20130926; WO 2012065839 A1 20120524

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2018-05-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 992921 T

- Effective date: 20180515

2018-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2018-04-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2018-01-10 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171213

2016-07-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160610

2014-02-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2013-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130417

2013-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR