Global Patent Index - EP 2640850 A1

EP 2640850 A1 2013-09-25 - METHOD FOR DETECTING NUCLEIC ACIDS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETECTING NUCLEIC ACIDS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON NUKLEINSÄUREN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DÉTECTION D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES

Publication

EP 2640850 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 11785410 A

Priority

  • EP 10191872 A
  • EP 2011070449 W
  • EP 11785410 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2455485A1] Method for simultaneously detecting a specific nucleic acid target molecule in many samples by nucleic acid amplification, comprises: (a) providing at least two nucleic acid comprising samples; (b) contacting the samples with a forward primer and a reverse primer comprising a 3' and a 5' portion; (c) amplifying the obtained samples; (d) contacting the amplified samples with a solid substrate on which oligonucleotides are immobilized at a preselected site; and (e) ascertaining the bond of the amplification products from step (c) at the oligonucleotides immobilized on the solid substrate. Method for simultaneously detecting at least one specific nucleic acid target molecule in many samples by nucleic acid amplification, comprises: (a) providing at least two nucleic acid comprising samples; (b) contacting the samples with a forward primer and a reverse primer comprising a 3' and a 5' portion, where the forward and reverse primers in the 3' portion contain a nucleotide sequence that is complementary to the amplifying nucleic acid target molecule, and the forward or reverse primer in the 5' portion comprises an oligonucleotide having an artificial nucleic acid sequence that is associated with the individual samples; (c) amplifying the obtained samples; (d) contacting the amplified samples with a solid substrate on which oligonucleotides are immobilized at a preselected site, where the oligonucleotides comprise at their 3' ends of the artificial nucleic acid sequence associated with the individual samples; and (e) ascertaining the bond of the amplification products from step (c) at the oligonucleotides immobilized on the solid substrate.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6837 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6853 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C12Q 1/6837 + C12Q 2565/514 + C12Q 2563/179 + C12Q 2533/101
  2. C12Q 1/6853 + C12Q 2565/514 + C12Q 2563/179 + C12Q 2525/161

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2012066121A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2455485 A1 20120523; AU 2011331121 A1 20130627; CA 2817426 A1 20120524; EP 2640850 A1 20130925; US 2013237450 A1 20130912; WO 2012066121 A1 20120524

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-14 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2017-05-31 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20150227

2016-11-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160601

2014-02-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2013-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR