Global Patent Index - EP 2640889 A1

EP 2640889 A1 2013-09-25 - FRAME FOR A DRYING SECTION

Title (en)

FRAME FOR A DRYING SECTION

Title (de)

RAHMEN FÜR EINEN TROCKNUNGSBEREICH

Title (fr)

BÂTI POUR UNE SECTION DE SÉCHAGE

Publication

EP 2640889 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 10782254 A

Priority

EP 2010067730 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012065644A1] According to the invention, a frame (1) for a drying cylinder group of a drying section of a web forming machine is provided, which comprises a pair of lower frame side elements (2) extending in machine direction and being provided on the driving side and the tending side of the web forming machine, wherein each lower frame side element (2) comprises a horizontal beam (21) adapted to support a group of drying cylinders of the web forming machine and a plurality of vertical beams (22) located below the horizontal beam (21) for supporting the same.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/04 (2006.01); D21F 5/02 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2012065644A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2012065644 A1 20120524; CN 103354852 A 20131016; EP 2640889 A1 20130925

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151027

2015-07-15 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150616

2014-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALMET TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2014-02-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2013-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130312

2013-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR