Global Patent Index - EP 2641135 A1

EP 2641135 A1 2013-09-25 - ENERGY AND SYSTEM MONITORING ARRANGEMENT ON METALLURGICAL EQUIPMENT

Title (en)

ENERGY AND SYSTEM MONITORING ARRANGEMENT ON METALLURGICAL EQUIPMENT

Title (de)

ENERGIE- UND SYSTEMMONITORING AN HÜTTENTECHNISCHEN EINRICHTUNGEN

Title (fr)

SURVEILLANCE DE SYSTÈMES ET DE LA CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE D'INSTALLATIONS MÉTALLURGIQUES

Publication

EP 2641135 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 11749863 A

Priority

  • DE 102010051157 A
  • DE 102010063284 A
  • EP 2011065268 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012065762A1] The invention relates to a system for monitoring the energy consumption of individual components of metallurgical plants, comprising at least one means for detecting the energy consumption of selected plant components, at least one means for recording and storing the energy consumption thus detected, and a central analysis/evaluating unit that records the maximum system utilisation, the detected energy consumptions and data relating to system operating status, in particular of process parameters, and displays at least the detected energy consumptions and the process parameters with each other as time-dependent variables and processes same.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05B 15/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2012065762A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102010063284 A1 20120516; EP 2641135 A1 20130925; WO 2012065762 A1 20120524

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20161025

2016-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160422

2015-07-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH

2014-02-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2013-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130617

2013-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR