Global Patent Index - EP 2641637 A2

EP 2641637 A2 2013-09-25 - Ski with fixing device for a ski binding

Title (en)

Ski with fixing device for a ski binding

Title (de)

Schi mit Verbindungsvorrichtung für eine Schibindung

Title (fr)

Ski doté d'un dispositif de liaison pour une fixation de ski

Publication

EP 2641637 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 13159657 A

Priority

AT 3342012 A

Abstract (en)

The ski (1) has a connecting device (3) connecting a ski binding comprising a front and rear cup piece to the ski. A coupling device (18) comprises a connecting arm including a first articulated connection to a flexural element in first end portion and a second articulated connection to the ski in second end portion. The first or second articulated connections is placed on a guide carriage displaceable in a sliding movement in a ski longitudinal direction. A restrictor element is provided for suppressing, restricting or inhibiting lifting movements of the flexural element relative to the ski. The flexural element of the support body is made from injection molded plastic reinforced with glass fiber.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Schi (1) mit einer Verbindungsvorrichtung (3) zum Verbinden einer Schibindung mit dem Schi (1). Die Verbindungsvorrichtung (3) umfasst dabei einen plattenartigen Tragkörper (4), der in seinem Längsmittelabschnitt (7) eine Befestigungszone (8) zur starren Verbindung mit dem Schi (1) aufweist. Zumindest der vordere Endabschnitt (5) des Tragkörpers (4) bildet gegenüber der Befestigungszone (8) und dem Schi (1) einen freikragenden Biegeträger (10) aus. Der freikragende Biegeträger (10) ist dabei aus Kunststoff gebildet und über eine Kopplungsvorrichtung (18) mit dem Schi (1) gekoppelt. Diese Kopplungsvorrichtung (18) umfasst einen Verbindungsarm, der in seinem ersten Endabschnitt eine erste Gelenksverbindung gegenüber dem Biegeträger (10) und in seinem zweiten Endabschnitt eine zweite Gelenksverbindung gegenüber dem Schi (1) aufweist. Die erste oder zweite Gelenksverbindung (25, 26) ist an einem in Schilängsrichtung gleitend verstellbaren Führungsschlitten ausgebildet und ein Begrenzungselement (34) ist zur Unterdrückung, Begrenzung oder Hemmung von Abhebebewegungen des Biegeträgers (10) gegenüber dem Schi (1) ausgebildet.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/005 (2013.01); A63C 9/003 (2013.01); A63C 9/007 (2013.01); A63C 2009/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2641637 A2 20130925; EP 2641637 A3 20150701; AT 512187 A4 20130615; AT 512187 B1 20130615; US 2013249193 A1 20130926; US 8720935 B2 20140513

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20161007

2016-06-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160527

2016-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20151223

2016-02-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2015-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2015-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME

2015-07-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63C 9/00 20120101AFI20150522BHEP

2014-04-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATOMIC AUSTRIA GMBH

2013-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME