Global Patent Index - EP 2641845 A2

EP 2641845 A2 2013-09-25 - RECEPTION APPARATUS USED BY BEING COUPLED TO A NECK OF A CONTAINER

Title (en)

RECEPTION APPARATUS USED BY BEING COUPLED TO A NECK OF A CONTAINER

Title (de)

AN DEN HALS EINES BEHÄLTERS GEKOPPELTE EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE RÉCEPTION UTILISÉ ACCOUPLÉ À UN COL D'UN RÉCIPIENT

Publication

EP 2641845 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 11840754 A

Priority

  • KR 20100113615 A
  • KR 20100115898 A
  • KR 2011008735 W

Abstract (en)

A reception apparatus to be coupled to container necks having different sizes has a main body in which a reception unit comprising a storage space is formed, and a lower side having a threaded part. Threads fitted to the sizes of the container necks are formed within the thread portion of the reception apparatus. The threads are formed to be capable of being coupled to a plurality of container necks, or formed of elastic threads integrally or separately produced.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/28 (2006.01); B65D 25/08 (2006.01); B65D 41/04 (2006.01); B65D 51/18 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/02 (2013.01); B65D 51/28 (2013.01); B65D 51/2835 (2013.01); B65D 51/2864 (2013.01); B65D 2251/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2641845 A2 20130925; EP 2641845 A4 20140702; CN 103313917 A 20130918; CN 103313917 B 20160120; JP 2014500202 A 20140109; JP 6113074 B2 20170412; US 2014144864 A1 20140529; WO 2012067418 A2 20120524; WO 2012067418 A3 20120907

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160601

2015-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150428

2014-07-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20140602

2014-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 51/28 20060101AFI20140526BHEP

2014-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 41/04 20060101ALI20140526BHEP

2014-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 51/18 20060101ALI20140526BHEP

2014-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 81/32 20060101ALI20140526BHEP

2014-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 25/08 20060101ALI20140526BHEP

2014-02-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2013-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEE , SEONG-JAE

2013-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR