Global Patent Index - EP 2642224 A2

EP 2642224 A2 2013-09-25 - Refrigeration and/or freezer device

Title (en)

Refrigeration and/or freezer device

Title (de)

Kühl- und/oder Gefriergerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de réfrigération et/ou de congélation

Publication

EP 2642224 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 13001368 A

Priority

  • DE 102012005490 A
  • DE 102012009457 A

Abstract (en)

The cooling- or freezing apparatus has two compartments (20), where a horizontal dividing plate (10) is provided to separate one compartment from another compartment. An evaporator (40) is provided for cooling the compartments, and is arranged in or on the horizontal dividing plate. A ventilator (60) is arranged in such a way that it directly or indirectly supplies the cooled air into the compartments in an operating mode of the apparatus. The compartments are formed by a cold storage compartment (30) or cold storage tray, and are arranged beneath and above the horizontal dividing plate. An independent claim is included for a method for operating a cooling- or freezing apparatus.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Kühl- und/oder Gefriergerät mit wenigstens einem ersten Kompartiment und mit wenigstens einem zweiten Kompartiment, das im Betrieb des Gerätes bei einer geringeren oder bei derselben Temperatur betrieben wird als/wie das erste Kompartiment, wobei wenigstens eine horizontale Trennplatte vorgesehen ist, die das erste von dem zweiten Kompartiment trennt, und wobei wenigstens ein Verdampfer zur Kühlung des ersten Kompartimentes und/oder des zweiten Kompartimentes vorgesehen ist, wobei der wenigstens eine Verdampfer in oder an der horizontalen Trennplatte angeordnet ist und wobei wenigstens ein Ventilator vorgesehen ist, der derart angeordnet ist, dass er in zumindest einem Betriebsmodus des Gerätes die von dem genannten Verdampfer gekühlte Luft unmittelbar oder mittelbar in das erste Kompartiment und/oder in das zweite Kompartiment fördert.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/065 (2013.01); F25D 21/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2642224 A2 20130925; EP 2642224 A3 20150722; EP 2642224 B1 20170628; DE 102012009457 A1 20130919

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 905245 T

- Effective date: 20170715

2017-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-06-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-02-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170124

2016-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160112

2015-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2015-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME

2015-07-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25D 17/06 20060101AFI20150616BHEP

2013-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME