Global Patent Index - EP 2642776 A1

EP 2642776 A1 2013-09-25 - Method, Communication Module, Message Service Server and System for handling of an external device

Title (en)

Method, Communication Module, Message Service Server and System for handling of an external device

Title (de)

Verfahren, Kommunikationsmodul, Nachrichtendienstserver und System zur Handhabung einer externen Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé, module de communication, serveur de services de messagerie et système de manipulation d'un dispositif externe

Publication

EP 2642776 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 13160619 A

Priority

DE 102012102543 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a Method for handling at least one external device (13) in an environment (U), wherein the environment (U) comprises at least one central handling unit (10) and at least one communication module (12), wherein at least one external device (13) is assigned to the at least one communication module (12), and wherein a dialogue session (D) is established between the at least one central handling unit (10) and at least one of the further components of the environment (U). The method is characterized in that, in the dialogue session (D) at least one request message (50, 51) relating to the handling of the external device (13) is transmitted, during the existence of the dialogue session (D) a response message (56, 57) relating to the request message (50, 51) is generated, wherein the response message (50, 51) comprises handling information (55), relating to the handling of the external device (13), and the response message (56, 57) is a confirmation message on the receipt of the request message (50, 51) at a component of the environment (U) and the response message (56, 57) is transferred back within the same dialogue session (D). Furthermore, the present invention relates to a communication module (12), a message service server (11) as well as to a system (1).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 4/14 (2009.01); H04W 4/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 4/14 (2013.01); H04W 4/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 6091958 A 20000718 - BERGKVIST BENGT [SE], et al
  • [Y] WO 2011099774 A2 20110818 - LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al
  • [A] EP 1798995 A2 20070620 - QUALCOMM INC [US]
  • [A] US 2002128024 A1 20020912 - PUSL STEFAN [DE]
  • [A] US 2009221310 A1 20090903 - CHEN FANG [CN], et al
  • [A] "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; Technical realization of the Short Message Service (SMS) (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.040, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, vol. CT WG1, no. V11.1.0, 13 March 2012 (2012-03-13), pages 1 - 202, XP050580115

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2642776 A1 20130925; DE 102012102543 A1 20130926; US 2013303205 A1 20131114; US 9119042 B2 20150825

INPADOC legal status


2015-09-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VODAFONE LIBERTEL B.V.

2015-09-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VODAFONE GMBH

2015-08-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOYLAN, CORNELIUS

2015-08-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RODERMUND, FRIEDHELM

2015-08-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAMMERTS VAN BUEREN, JEFFREY

2014-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VODAFONE GMBH

2014-04-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140320

2014-04-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME