Global Patent Index - EP 2649516 A4

EP 2649516 A4 2017-10-25 - PLATFORM-AGNOSTIC DIAGNOSTIC DATA COLLECTION AND DISPLAY

Title (en)

PLATFORM-AGNOSTIC DIAGNOSTIC DATA COLLECTION AND DISPLAY

Title (de)

PLATTFORMUNBEWUSSTE DIAGNOSEDATENERFASSUNG UND -ANZEIGE

Title (fr)

COLLECTE ET AFFICHAGE DE DONNÉES DE DIAGNOSTIC INDÉPENDANTS D'UNE PLATEFORME

Publication

EP 2649516 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 11846533 A

Priority

  • US 96363010 A
  • US 2011063616 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2012151450A1] A data collection system may instrument and collect data from arbitrary executable code by loading the executable code into memory and instrumenting the code according to monitoring conditions. The instrumentation may include pointers or bindings to a data collector that may gather and store information when the monitoring condition exists. A display module may allow a programmer to browse the results. The data collection system may operate on any type of native code or intermediate code and may operate with or without symbol tables.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/06 (2006.01); G06F 11/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 11/3664 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2012151450 A1 20120614; CN 102541731 A 20120704; CN 102541731 B 20150701; EP 2649516 A2 20131016; EP 2649516 A4 20171025; WO 2012078691 A2 20120614; WO 2012078691 A3 20120802

INPADOC legal status


2018-03-28 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20180220

2017-10-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170925

2017-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 11/36 20060101ALI20170919BHEP

2017-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 9/06 20060101AFI20170919BHEP

2015-03-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC

2014-03-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2013-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130510

2013-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR