EP 2668104 B1 20170405 - COMMAND AND CONTROL APPARATUS TO CONTROL AND COMMAND OPERATING UNITS OF A PACKING MACHINE AND CORRESPONDING METHOD
Title (en)
COMMAND AND CONTROL APPARATUS TO CONTROL AND COMMAND OPERATING UNITS OF A PACKING MACHINE AND CORRESPONDING METHOD
Title (de)
BEFEHLS- UND STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG UND ANWEISUNG VON BETRIEBSEINHEITEN EINER VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN
Title (fr)
APPAREIL DE COMMANDE ET DE CONTRÔLE POUR CONTRÔLER ET COMMANDER DES UNITÉS OPÉRATIVES D'UNE MACHINE DE CONDITIONNEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT
Publication
Application
Priority
- IT MI20110092 A 20110126
- IB 2012000085 W 20120123
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2012101493A1] Apparatus to control operating units of a packing machine (1) suitable to complete organized groups of smoking articles with the required accessories, comprising a central wrapping wheel (13), to complete at least one organized group of smoking articles with a collar (6) and at least a second external wrapping sheet (8), the wrapping wheel (13) comprising peripheral reception drawers (14) and at least one or more of the following operating units (22, 25, 26, 27, 34, 37): movement means (9), positioning means (25), transfer means (22), transfer means (27) of the wheel type or linear, wheel type final packaging and wrapping means (34). Said command and control apparatus comprises step-wise servomotors (71) each provided with a position transducer and governed by a central command and control unit (100) of the programmable type and comprising programmable data and times base means (101) which contain information relating at least to one or more work cycles to be carried out, said wrapping wheel (13) being associated for the purposes of the control and command in a bidirectional and independent manner with the step-wise servomotor (71) of each operating unit (22, 25, 26, 27, 34, 37) governed by the central unit (100), the central unit (100) being configured to determine, for each pair (A, B; A, B l; A, B2; A, B3; A, B4) of step-wise servomotors (71) associated with the wrapping wheel (13) and the operating units (22, 25, 26, 27, 34, 37), a univocal and bidirectional dialog, said univocal and bidirectional dialog being assisted by the central unit (100) and involving the position transducer of both step- wise servomotors (71) involved, said univocal and bidirectional dialog serving, through the central unit (100), every other pair (A, B; A, B l; A, B2; A, B3; A, B4) generated between the wrapping wheel (13) and the operating units (22, 25, 26, 27, 34, 37).
IPC 8 full level
B65B 19/22 (2006.01); B65B 57/12 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B65B 19/223 (2013.01); B65B 19/228 (2013.01); B65B 19/28 (2013.01); B65B 57/12 (2013.01); B65B 2220/16 (2013.01)
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Focke & CO
- EP 0716016 A1 19960612 - SASIB SPA [IT]
- EP 0055366 A2 19820707 - IBM [US]
- EP 1396430 A2 20040310 - FOCKE & CO [DE]
- EP 0336012 A1 19891011 - FUJI MACHINERY CO [JP]
- WO 2004097538 A1 20041111 - FOCKE & CO [DE], et al
- DE 19735942 A1 19990304 - ELAU ELEKTRONIK AUTOMATIONS AG [DE]
- DE 3615442 A1 19861113 - FUJI MACHINERY CO [JP]
- DE 10312379 A1 20031016 - HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]
- US 5458075 A 19951017 - TICE WILLIAM A [US], et al
- DE 3878222 T2 19930603 - FUJI MACHINERY CO [JP]
- EP 0297266 A2 19890104 - FOCKE & CO [DE]
- DE 102008033549 A1 20090219 - GD SPA [IT]
- EP 0957028 A1 19991117 - MARCHESINI GROUP SPA [IT]
- DE 602004004298 T2 20070628 - GD SPA [IT]
- EP 1195323 A1 20020410 - GD SPA [IT]
- GB 2055235 A 19810225 - MOLINS LTD
- US 2002117179 A1 20020829 - BERGO DANIELE [IT], et al
- EP 2258620 A1 20101208 - CT PACK SRL [IT]
- WO 2007059247 A1 20070524 - 3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]
- US 2003146068 A1 20030807 - POLLONI ROBERTO [IT], et al
- US 6526725 B1 20030304 - WILLIAMS EDWARD F [US]
- GB 2302856 A 19970205 - THURNE ENG CO LTD [GB]
- EP 0727290 A1 19960821 - ROSE VERPACKUNGSMASCH [DE]
- US 5706627 A 19980113 - KIRKA ARDE [US], et al
- US 5507907 A 19960416 - KROPP KARL M [US], et al
- JP H03198937 A 19910830 - TOSHIBA CORP
- EP 0409377 A1 19910123 - OMORI MACHINERY [JP]
- DE 3744457 A1 19880707 - IMA SPA [IT]
- US 4809481 A 19890307 - FRUEH HANS R [CH], et al
- EP 0230137 B1 19900718
- US 3956870 A 19760518 - KRUSE FRIEDEL, et al
- US 3899863 A 19750819 - SERAGNOLI ARIOSTO, et al
- GB 1429641 A 19760324 - HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG
- US 3802325 A 19740409 - BARDENHAGEN D, et al
- US 3762126 A 19731002 - COURT W
- GB 1100652 A 19680124 - ALLEN TRANSMATIC LTD
- "SERCOS III", SERCOS INTERFACE NEWS, February 2006 (2006-02-01), pages 1 - 20, XP055456549
- ATLAS COPCO CONTROL SA: "About the PAM & SAM System", DOC. 9032011852 REV. APRIL 8, 1999, 8 April 1999 (1999-04-08), pages 1 - 94, XP055456312
- PAVING THE WAY FOR GENERATION '3' PACKAGING MACHINERY, 2002
- ANONYMOUS: "Servomotor", WIKIPEDIA, 7 March 2017 (2017-03-07), XP055396727, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://de.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Servomotor&oldid=163347715>
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2012101493 A1 20120802; CN 103596845 A 20140219; CN 103596845 B 20150708; EP 2668104 A1 20131204; EP 2668104 B1 20170405; IN 1546MUN2013 A 20150612; IT 1403907 B1 20131108; IT MI20110092 A1 20120727; PL 2668104 T3 20171031; RU 2013138623 A 20150310; RU 2587052 C2 20160610
DOCDB simple family (application)
IB 2012000085 W 20120123; CN 201280011702 A 20120123; EP 12710114 A 20120123; IN 1546MUN2013 A 20130813; IT MI20110092 A 20110126; PL 12710114 T 20120123; RU 2013138623 A 20120123