Global Patent Index - EP 2675297 A4

EP 2675297 A4 20141001 - FOODSTUFF COMPRISING AN EXTRACT MIXTURE

Title (en)

FOODSTUFF COMPRISING AN EXTRACT MIXTURE

Title (de)

NAHRUNGSMITTEL MIT EINER EXTRAKTMISCHUNG

Title (fr)

PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE CONTENANT UN MÉLANGE D'EXTRAITS

Publication

EP 2675297 A4 20141001 (EN)

Application

EP 12747393 A 20120216

Priority

  • SE 1150123 A 20110216
  • SE 2012050171 W 20120216

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012112116A1] The present invention discloses a foodstuff comprising an extract mixture comprising a hops (Humulus lupulus) extract in a content of 250 - 2500 mg, calculated on dry hops raw material, and a lemon balm (Melissa officinalis) extract in a content of 500 - 7000 mg, calculated on dry balm raw material. The total content of hops extract and lemon balm extract together is in the range 1500 - 9500 mg. Said foodstuff, which preferably is essentially free from valerian or other sopoforic components, is suitable for providing help for persons having trouble falling asleep.

IPC 8 full level

A23L 1/30 (2006.01); A23L 2/52 (2006.01); A61K 36/185 (2006.01); A61K 36/53 (2006.01); A61P 25/20 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

A23L 2/52 (2013.01); A23L 33/105 (2016.08); A61K 36/185 (2013.01); A61K 36/53 (2013.01); A61P 25/20 (2018.01)

C-Set (source: EP)

  1. A61K 36/185 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 36/53 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 2007196348 A1 20070823 - GARDINER PAUL T [CA], et al
  • [Y] FRIEDE M ET AL: "Pflanzliche Wirkstoffe gegen Schlafstörungen /// Herbal agent for the treatment of insomnia", TW NEUROLOGIE, PSYCHIATRIE, BRAUN, KARLSRUHE, DE, vol. 11, no. 10, 1 January 1997 (1997-01-01), pages 697 - 700, XP009179625, ISSN: 0935-3224
  • [Y] JASPERSEN-SCHIB R: "Pflanzliche Sedativa = Herbal sedatives", SCHWEIZERISCHE APOTHEKER ZEITUNG, SCHWEIZERISCHER APOTHEKER VEREIN, LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 127, no. 22, 1 January 1989 (1989-01-01), pages 568 - 572, XP009179630, ISSN: 0036-7508
  • [Y] MATTHIAS UNGER: "Pflanzliche Sedativa: Neue Aspekte zu altbewährten Arzneipflanzen", PHARMAZIE IN UNSERER ZEIT, vol. 36, no. 3, 1 May 2007 (2007-05-01), pages 206 - 212, XP055004343, ISSN: 0048-3664, DOI: 10.1002/pauz.200600219
  • [Y] HAMACHER H: "Hypnotics and sedatives in self-medication", DEUTSCHE APOTHEKER ZEITUNG, DEUTSCHER APOTHEKER VERLAG, STUTTGART, DE, vol. 124, no. 37, 1 January 1984 (1984-01-01), pages 1769 - 1777, XP001526299, ISSN: 0011-9857
  • [Y] BRENDLER THORNAS ET AL: "Lemon balm (Melissa officinalis L.): An evidence-based systematic review by the natural standard research collaboration", JOURNAL OF HERBAL PHARMACOTHERAPY, HAWORTH HERBAL PRESS, BINGHAMTON, US, vol. 5, no. 4, 1 January 2005 (2005-01-01), pages 71 - 114, XP009153568, ISSN: 1522-8940
  • See also references of WO 2012112116A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 2012112116 A1 20120823; EP 2675297 A1 20131225; EP 2675297 A4 20141001

DOCDB simple family (application)

SE 2012050171 W 20120216; EP 12747393 A 20120216