Global Patent Index - EP 2676300 A4

EP 2676300 A4 2017-05-03 - METHODS OF FORMING SEMICONDUCTOR FILMS INCLUDING I2-II-IV-VI4 AND I2-(II,IV)-IV-VI4 SEMICONDUCTOR FILMS AND ELECTRONIC DEVICES INCLUDING THE SEMICONDUCTOR FILMS

Title (en)

METHODS OF FORMING SEMICONDUCTOR FILMS INCLUDING I2-II-IV-VI4 AND I2-(II,IV)-IV-VI4 SEMICONDUCTOR FILMS AND ELECTRONIC DEVICES INCLUDING THE SEMICONDUCTOR FILMS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HALBLEITERSCHICHTEN MIT I2-II-IV-VI4 UND I2-(II, IV) VI4-IV-HALBLEITERSCHICHTEN UND ELEKTRONISCHEN BAUELEMENTEN EINSCHLIESSLICH DER HALBLEITERSCHICHTEN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉS DE FORMATION DE FILMS SEMICONDUCTEURS COMPRENANT DES FILMS SEMICONDUCTEURS I2-II-IV-VI4 ET I2-(II,IV)-IV-VI4 ET DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES COMPRENANT

Publication

EP 2676300 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 12747692 A

Priority

  • US 201161444398 P
  • US 2012025706 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012112927A2] Embodiments of the present invention generally include methods for forming semiconductor films having nominal I2-II-IV-VI4 stoichiometry, such as CZTS or CZTSSe, using a solution of including sources of the I, II, IV, and VI elements in a liquid solvent. Precursors may be mixed in the solvent to form the solution. Metal halide salts may be used as precursors in some examples. The solution may be coated onto a substrate and annealed to yield the semiconductor film. In some examples, the source of the 'I' and 'IV' elements may contain the elements in a +2 oxidation state, while the semiconductor film may contain the 'I' element in a +1 oxidation state and the 'IV' element in a +4 oxidation state. Examples may be used to provide I2-(II,IV)-IV-VI4 films.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/368 (2006.01); H01L 31/032 (2006.01); H01L 31/072 (2012.01); H01L 31/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 31/18 (2013.01); H01L 21/02422 (2013.01); H01L 21/02491 (2013.01); H01L 21/02557 (2013.01); H01L 21/0256 (2013.01); H01L 21/02568 (2013.01); H01L 21/02628 (2013.01); H01L 31/0326 (2013.01); H01L 31/072 (2013.01); Y02E 10/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XI] WO 2010138982 A1 20101209 - ISOVOLTAIC GMBH [AT], et al
  • [XI] WO 2010094779 A1 20100826 - CARL VON OSSIETZKY UNI OLDENBU [DE], et al
  • [XI] WO 2010138636 A2 20101202 - PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al
  • [A] EP 2234168 A1 20100929 - SHANGHAI INST CERAMICS [CN]
  • [XI] PRABHAKAR T ET AL: "Ultrasonic spray pyrolysis of CZTS solar cell absorber layers and characterization studies", 35TH IEEE PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE (PVSC), 20-25 JUNE 2010, HONOLULU, HI, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, 20 June 2010 (2010-06-20), pages 1964 - 1969, XP031786157, ISBN: 978-1-4244-5890-5
  • [XI] KAMOUN ET AL: "Fabrication and characterization of Cu"2ZnSnS"4 thin films deposited by spray pyrolysis technique", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 515, no. 15, 27 April 2007 (2007-04-27), pages 5949 - 5952, XP022212799, ISSN: 0040-6090, DOI: 10.1016/J.TSF.2006.12.144

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2012112927 A2 20120823; WO 2012112927 A3 20121108; CN 103650155 A 20140319; CN 103650155 B 20161012; EP 2676300 A2 20131225; EP 2676300 A4 20170503; JP 2014506018 A 20140306; JP 5774727 B2 20150909; US 2014220728 A1 20140807

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20171031

2017-05-03 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 31/032 20060101ALI20170327BHEP

2017-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 31/18 20060101ALI20170327BHEP

2017-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 21/368 20060101AFI20170327BHEP

2017-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 31/072 20120101ALI20170327BHEP

2014-05-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2013-12-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130828

2013-12-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR