Global Patent Index - EP 2679460 B1

EP 2679460 B1 2017-10-18 - DRIVE CONTROL DEVICE OF HYBRID VEHICLE

Title (en)

DRIVE CONTROL DEVICE OF HYBRID VEHICLE

Title (de)

STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN HYBRIDFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE VÉHICULE HYBRIDE

Publication

EP 2679460 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 11859079 A

Priority

JP 2011053689 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2679460A1] In a drive control apparatus (1) of a hybrid vehicle, provisional target engine power calculating means (17D) of control means (17) compares provisional target engine power which is calculated from a target drive power and a target charge/discharge power with a target engine power lower limit value and, when the provisional target engine power is smaller than the target engine power lower limit value, sets the target engine power lower limit value to the provisional target engine power. Motor torque instruction value operating means (17L) of the control means (17) calculates a torque instruction value of each of a plurality of motor generators (4, 5) by using a torque balance equation including a target engine torque which is obtained from a target engine operation point and an electric power balance equation including a target electric power. Thus, such a situation that the target engine power is set to a low power in dependence on a vehicle speed is reduced, and when a large drive force is requested, an output can be raised so as to make a response to such a request.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60W 10/08 (2006.01); B60K 6/445 (2007.10); B60W 10/06 (2006.01); B60W 10/26 (2006.01); B60W 20/00 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60W 20/13 (2016.01); B60K 6/365 (2013.01); B60K 6/445 (2013.01); B60W 10/06 (2013.01); B60W 10/08 (2013.01); B60W 10/26 (2013.01); B60W 20/10 (2013.01); B60W 30/1882 (2013.01); B60W 2510/244 (2013.01); B60W 2520/10 (2013.01); B60W 2540/10 (2013.01); B60W 2710/0677 (2013.01); B60W 2710/086 (2013.01); Y02T 10/56 (2013.01); Y02T 10/6239 (2013.01); Y02T 10/6286 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7258 (2013.01); Y02T 10/84 (2013.01); Y02T 10/92 (2013.01); Y10S 903/93 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2679460 A1 20140101; EP 2679460 A4 20160302; EP 2679460 B1 20171018; CN 103380043 A 20131030; CN 103380043 B 20151216; JP 5765596 B2 20150819; JP WO2012114429 A1 20140707; US 2014088807 A1 20140327; US 8948950 B2 20150203; WO 2012114429 A1 20120830

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180218

2018-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180118

2018-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180119

2018-05-31 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-05-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-05-31 [PG25 RS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-04-30 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180118

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-03-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602011042592

- Representative's name: CABINET HIRSCH & ASSOCIES, FR

2018-03-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 937653 T

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-03-12 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-02-21 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20171018

2017-11-23 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602011042592

2017-11-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 937653 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-08-09 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170711

2016-03-02 [RA4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60W 10/06 20060101ALI20160125BHEP

2016-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60K 6/445 20071001ALI20160125BHEP

2016-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60W 20/00 20160101ALI20160125BHEP

2016-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60W 10/26 20060101ALI20160125BHEP

2016-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60W 10/08 20060101AFI20160125BHEP

2014-05-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2014-01-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130923

2014-01-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR