Global Patent Index - EP 2679483 A4

EP 2679483 A4 2017-05-17 - STEAM TURBINE DRIVING MACHINE, AND SHIP AND GAS LIQUEFACTION APPARATUS EACH EQUIPPED WITH STEAM TURBINE DRIVING MACHINE

Title (en)

STEAM TURBINE DRIVING MACHINE, AND SHIP AND GAS LIQUEFACTION APPARATUS EACH EQUIPPED WITH STEAM TURBINE DRIVING MACHINE

Title (de)

DAMPFTURBINEN-ANTRIEBSMASCHINE SOWIE SCHIFF UND GASVERFLÜSSIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT DER DAMPFTURBINEN-ANTRIEBSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT À TURBINE À VAPEUR, ET NAVIRE ET APPAREIL DE LIQUÉFACTION DE GAZ ÉQUIPÉS CHACUN D'UNE MACHINE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT À TURBINE À VAPEUR

Publication

EP 2679483 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 12749246 A

Priority

  • JP 2011040717 A
  • JP 2012053017 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2679483A1] A steam turbine driver which enables using two shafts without increasing an installation space, and can further independently drive the two output shafts with a simple configuration is provided. A steam turbine driver (1A) includes: an ahead high-pressure turbine (7) driven upon supply of steam; a first drive shaft (4) driven by the ahead high-pressure turbine (7); an ahead first low-pressure turbine (11) and an ahead second low-pressure turbine (13) driven upon supply of steam discharged from the ahead high-pressure turbine (7); and a second drive shaft (14) driven by the ahead first low-pressure turbine (11) and the ahead second low-pressure turbine (13), the steam turbine driver further including a steam dump pipe (33) and a pressure reducing valve (35) that control a pressure of the steam discharged from the high-pressure turbine (7) and supplied to the first low-pressure turbine (11) and the second low-pressure turbine (13).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 21/06 (2006.01); B63B 25/16 (2006.01); B63H 5/08 (2006.01); B63H 23/10 (2006.01); B63H 23/20 (2006.01); F01D 17/20 (2006.01); F01K 7/16 (2006.01); F01K 7/18 (2006.01); F01K 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 21/06 (2013.01); B63H 23/10 (2013.01); F01K 7/16 (2013.01); F01K 15/04 (2013.01); F25J 1/0022 (2013.01); F25J 1/005 (2013.01); F25J 1/0204 (2013.01); F25J 1/0282 (2013.01); F25J 1/0288 (2013.01); F25J 2230/20 (2013.01); F25J 2270/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2679483 A1 20140101; EP 2679483 A4 20170517; CN 103380056 A 20131030; CN 103380056 B 20160511; JP 2012176691 A 20120913; JP 5818459 B2 20151118; KR 101624017 B1 20160524; KR 20130106889 A 20130930; WO 2012114892 A1 20120830

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI SHIPBUILDING CO., LTD.

2018-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B63H 21/06 20060101ALI20180605BHEP

2018-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B63H 23/10 20060101ALI20180605BHEP

2018-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01K 15/04 20060101ALI20180605BHEP

2018-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25J 1/02 20060101AFI20180605BHEP

2018-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25J 1/00 20060101ALI20180605BHEP

2018-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01K 7/16 20060101ALI20180605BHEP

2017-05-17 [RA4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170419

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01K 7/18 20060101ALI20170411BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01K 15/04 20060101ALI20170411BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B63H 23/20 20060101ALI20170411BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01D 17/20 20060101ALI20170411BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B63B 25/16 20060101ALI20170411BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B63H 5/08 20060101ALI20170411BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B63H 23/10 20060101ALI20170411BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B63H 21/06 20060101AFI20170411BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01K 7/16 20060101ALI20170411BHEP

2014-06-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2014-01-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130916

2014-01-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR