EP 2687288 A1 20140122 - Method for predicting the efficiency of a TIO2 photocatalyst
Title (en)
Method for predicting the efficiency of a TIO2 photocatalyst
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Vorhersage der Effizienz eines TIO2-Katalysators
Title (fr)
Procédé pour prédire l'efficacité d'un photocatalyseur TIO2
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 12382289 A 20120719
Abstract (en)
The present invention relates to a method for predicting the efficiency of a TiO 2 photocatalyst in a light-induced reaction
IPC 8 full level
B01J 21/06 (2006.01); G01N 21/31 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B01J 21/063 (2013.01 - EP US); B01J 35/39 (2024.01 - EP US); G01N 21/63 (2013.01 - US); G01N 21/631 (2013.01 - EP US); B01D 53/8671 (2013.01 - EP US); B01D 2255/1021 (2013.01 - EP US); B01D 2255/1026 (2013.01 - EP US); B01D 2255/20707 (2013.01 - EP US); B01D 2255/20738 (2013.01 - EP US); B01D 2255/20753 (2013.01 - EP US); B01D 2255/20761 (2013.01 - EP US); B01D 2255/802 (2013.01 - EP US); B01D 2257/504 (2013.01 - EP US); B01J 23/40 (2013.01 - EP US); B01J 23/70 (2013.01 - EP US); B01J 37/349 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [XYI] ANA M. PEIRÓ ET AL: "Photochemical Reduction of Oxygen Adsorbed to Nanocrystalline TiO 2 Films: A Transient Absorption and Oxygen Scavenging Study of Different TiO 2 Preparations", THE JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY B, vol. 110, no. 46, 1 November 2006 (2006-11-01), pages 23255 - 23263, XP055041928, ISSN: 1520-6106, DOI: 10.1021/jp064591c
- [Y] NI M ET AL: "A review and recent developments in photocatalytic water-splitting using TiO2 for hydrogen production", RENEWABLE AND SUSTAINABLE ENERGY REVIEWS, vol. 11, 1 January 2007 (2007-01-01), pages 401 - 425, XP002539313, ISSN: 1364-0321, DOI: 10.1016/J.RSER.2005.01.009
- [Y] JEFFREY C S WU ET AL: "Photo reduction of CO2 to methanol via TiO2 photocatalyst", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHOTOENERGY, vol. 7, 1 January 2005 (2005-01-01), pages 115 - 119, XP055041944
- [A] KAN FUJIHARA ET AL: "Time-resolved photoluminescence of particulate TiO2 photocatalysts suspended in aqueous solutions", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, vol. 132, 1 January 2000 (2000-01-01), pages 99 - 194, XP055041947
- [A] AKIRA YAMAKATA ET AL: "Time-resolved infrared absorption spectroscopy of photogenerated electrons in platinized TiO2 particles", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 333, 1 January 2001 (2001-01-01), pages 271 - 277, XP055041949
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 2687288 A1 20140122; AR 091772 A1 20150225; CA 2821131 A1 20140119; CL 2013002050 A1 20140905; CN 103575671 A 20140212; MX 2013008226 A 20140120; US 2014024121 A1 20140123
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 12382289 A 20120719; AR P130102517 A 20130715; CA 2821131 A 20130716; CL 2013002050 A 20130715; CN 201310304183 A 20130719; MX 2013008226 A 20130715; US 201313927665 A 20130626