EP 2688923 A4 20150520 - BRANCHED VINYL TERMINATED POLYMERS AND METHODS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF
Title (en)
BRANCHED VINYL TERMINATED POLYMERS AND METHODS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF
Title (de)
VERZWEIGTE VINYLTERMINIERTE POLYMERE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR
Title (fr)
POLYMÈRES RAMIFIÉS À TERMINAISON VINYLIQUE ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LES PRODUIRE
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201161467681 P 20110325
- EP 11165831 A 20110512
- US 2012027675 W 20120305
- EP 12762766 A 20120305
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2012134715A2] This invention relates to a process for polymerization, comprising (i) contacting, at a temperature greater than 35°C, one or more monomers comprising ethylene and/or propylene, with a catalyst system comprising a metallocene catalyst compound and an activator, (ii) converting at least 50 mol% of the monomer to polyolefin; and (iii) obtaining a branched polyolefin having greater than 50% allyl chain ends, relative to total unsaturated chain ends. The invention also relates to the branched polyolefins and functionalized branched polyolefins.
IPC 8 full level
C08F 10/06 (2006.01); C07C 2/34 (2006.01); C08F 4/6592 (2006.01); C08F 8/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
C07F 17/00 (2013.01); C08F 4/65908 (2013.01); C08F 10/06 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 2009318646 A1 20091224 - BRANT PATRICK [US], et al
- [X] US 2004127649 A1 20040701 - ARJUNAN PALANISAMY [US], et al
- [X] US 2010152388 A1 20100617 - JIANG PEIJUN [US], et al
- [X] US 6117962 A 20000912 - WENG WEIQING [US], et al
- [X] EP 2261292 A2 20101215 - EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US]
- [X] WO 2010074815 A1 20100701 - EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al
- [X] US 2003050411 A1 20030313 - GAYNOR SCOTT [US], et al
- [X] US 7700707 B2 20100420 - ABHARI RAMIN [US], et al
- [A] RESCONI L ET AL: "CHAIN TRANSFER REACTIONS IN PROPYLENE POLYMERIZATION WITH ZIRCONOCENE CATALYSTS", TOPICS IN CATALYSIS, BALTZER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BUSSUM, NL, vol. 7, 1 March 1999 (1999-03-01), pages 145 - 163, XP001027865, ISSN: 1022-5528, DOI: 10.1023/A:1019115801193
- [X] WEIQING WENG ET AL: "Long Chain Branched Isotactic Polypropylene", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 35, no. 10, 7 May 2002 (2002-05-07), pages 3838 - 3843, XP002668104, ISSN: 0024-9297, [retrieved on 20020416], DOI: 10.1021/MA020050J
- [X] WEIQING WENG ET AL: "Synthesis of vinyl-terminated isotactic poly(propylene)", MACROMOLECULAR RAPID COMMUNICATIONS, WILEY - V C H VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE, vol. 21, 1 January 2000 (2000-01-01), pages 1103 - 1107, XP002667876, ISSN: 1022-1336
- See references of WO 2012134715A2
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2012134715 A2 20121004; WO 2012134715 A3 20130117; CN 103443137 A 20131211; EP 2688923 A2 20140129; EP 2688923 A4 20150520; JP 2014508848 A 20140410; JP 5793820 B2 20151014
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2012027675 W 20120305; CN 201280014776 A 20120305; EP 12762766 A 20120305; JP 2014501090 A 20120305