Global Patent Index - EP 2710410 A4

EP 2710410 A4 20151028 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR OPTIMIZING LOW FREQUENCY OUTPUT FROM AIRGUN SOURCE ARRAYS

Title (en)

SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR OPTIMIZING LOW FREQUENCY OUTPUT FROM AIRGUN SOURCE ARRAYS

Title (de)

SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG EINER NIEDRIGFREQUENZAUSGABE VON LUFTGEWEHR-QUELLENARRAYS

Title (fr)

SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'OPTIMISATION DE LA PUISSANCE DE SORTIE À BASSE FRÉQUENCE ÉMANANT DE RÉSEAUX DE SOURCES DE TYPE CANON À AIR

Publication

EP 2710410 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 12789555 A

Priority

  • US 201113112869 A
  • US 201161568655 P
  • US 201213450477 A
  • US 2012038751 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2012162208A2] A technique provides a source design and method for increasing low frequency output of a marine source array. The approach comprises providing a plurality of airguns. At least some of the airguns are activated to generate an effective bubble energy. The effective bubble energy may be optimized through use, preparation and/or arrangement of the airguns.

IPC 8 full level

G01V 1/38 (2006.01); G01V 1/137 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

G01V 1/137 (2013.01); G01V 1/3861 (2013.01); G01V 1/006 (2013.01); G01V 2210/1212 (2013.01); G01V 2210/127 (2013.01); G01V 2210/1293 (2013.01); G01V 2210/161 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] WO 9848301 A1 19981029 - SAFAR MO [GB]
  • [YA] GB 2092750 A 19820818 - MOBIL OIL CORP
  • [YA] EP 0320073 A2 19890614 - SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]
  • [XY] Z C LUNNON ET AL: "An evaluation of peak and bubble tuning in sub-basalt seismology: modelling and results from OBS data", FIRST BREAK, vol. 21, no. 12, 1 December 2003 (2003-12-01), pages 51 - 56, XP055212689
  • [XAY] SATOSHI SHIMIZU ET AL: "Short Cluster Airgun Array for Shallow to Deep Crustal Survey", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF OFFSHORE AND POLAR ENGINEERING, vol. 19, no. 1, 1 March 2009 (2009-03-01), pages 60 - 65, XP055212664, ISSN: 1053-5381
  • [A] R M LAWS ET AL: "Computer modelling of clustered airguns", FIRST BREAK, vol. 8, no. 9, 1 September 1990 (1990-09-01), pages 331 - 338, XP055212437, DOI: 10.3997/1365-2397.1990017

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 2012162208 A2 20121129; WO 2012162208 A3 20130124; BR 112013029774 A2 20170124; EP 2710410 A2 20140326; EP 2710410 A4 20151028; MX 2013013383 A 20140108

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 2012038751 W 20120521; BR 112013029774 A 20120521; EP 12789555 A 20120521; MX 2013013383 A 20120521